Haney v. Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heather Haney
Defendant: Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05108
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 31, 2019. (jas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Hain Celestial Group, Inc.. (Barnes, Justin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Hain Celestial Group, Inc..(Barnes, Justin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER DENYING #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 12, 2019. (jas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Heather Haney. (Wood, Stephen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Heather Haney. (Wood, Stephen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/7/2019. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 1, 2019. (jas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hain Celestial Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Barnes, Justin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hain Celestial Group, Inc.. (Barnes, Justin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Robert Barnes on behalf of Hain Celestial Group, Inc.. (Barnes, Justin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Don A. Smith on behalf of Hain Celestial Group, Inc.. (Smith, Don)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Notice of Magistrate Availability, filed by Heather Haney. Hain Celestial Group, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Wood, Stephen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Hain Celestial Group, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Hain Celestial Group, Inc. for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Wood, Stephen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hain Celestial Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1925077), filed by Heather Haney.(Wood, Stephen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
June 3, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Civil Cover Sheet. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/5/2019 (lgd)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Heather Haney. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haney v. Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Haney
Represented By: Stephen Lee Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Robert Barnes
Represented By: Don A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?