Equity Bank v. Elite Equity Group of Missouri LLC et al
Plaintiff: Equity Bank
Defendant: Elite Equity Group of Missouri LLC, Roth Family, Inc., Randy Roth, Elite Home Builders of Missouri, Surfaces Inc., Jeff Roth, Elite Builders of Missouri, Ami Roth, VGP LLC, Roth Custom Homes, Roth Family Investments LLC, Roth Family Partnership LLP, Commercial Homes by Roth LLC, Roth Farms LLC, Mud Puddle Investments LLC, MPRP, LLC, ADR Homes By Roth, LLC and Elite Eqiuty Group of Arkansas LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv05121
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 22, 2019. (tg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Equity Bank. (Anderson, Heidi)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 9/3/2019 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 8, 2019. (slc)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kael K Bowling on behalf of All Defendants. (Bowling, Kael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-05027. Docket sheet received.
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 motion to change venue; transferring case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas, Fayetteville Division, for all further proceedings. Signed on 6/11/2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Levin, Benjamin) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in support re #12 MOTION to change venue MOTION TO TO TRANSFER VENUE MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by Clifford W Plunkett on behalf of Defendants ADR Homes by Roth LLC, Commercial Homes by Roth LLC, Elite Eqiuty Group of Arkansas LLC, Elite Equity Group of Missouri LLC, MPRP, LLC, Mud Puddle Investments LLC, Ami Roth, Jeff Roth, Randy Roth, Roth Family Inc., Roth Family Investments LLC, Roth Family Partnership LLP, Roth Farms LLC, Surfaces Inc., VGP LLC. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Plunkett, Clifford) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to change venue MOTION TO TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by Clifford W Plunkett on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF RANDY ROTH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE)(Plunkett, Clifford) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Certificate filed by Heidi V. Anderson on behalf of Plaintiff Equity Bank.(Anderson, Heidi) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Clifford W Plunkett on behalf of Defendants ADR Homes by Roth LLC, Commercial Homes by Roth LLC, Elite Eqiuty Group of Arkansas LLC, Elite Equity Group of Missouri LLC, MPRP, LLC, Mud Puddle Investments LLC, Ami Roth, Jeff Roth, Randy Roth, Roth Family Inc., Roth Family Investments LLC, Roth Family Partnership LLP, Roth Farms LLC, Surfaces Inc., VGP LLC.(Plunkett, Clifford) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Clifford W Plunkett on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party ADR Homes by Roth LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Commercial Homes by Roth LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Elite Eqiuty Group of Arkansas LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Elite Equity Group of Missouri LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party MPRP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Mud Puddle Investments LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Ami Roth(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Jeff Roth(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Randy Roth(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Roth Family Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Roth Family Investments LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Roth Family Partnership LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Roth Farms LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party Surfaces Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford W Plunkett added to party VGP LLC(pty:dft))(Plunkett, Clifford) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
May 1, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/13/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 5/29/2019. Signed on 4/29/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Please note the new case number: 19-5027-CV-SW-MDH. (Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
April 26, 2019 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for plaintiff and all defendants. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 5/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of ADR Homes by Roth LLC, Commercial Homes by Roth LLC, Elite Eqiuty Group of Arkansas LLC, Elite Equity Group of Missouri LLC, MPRP, LLC, Mud Puddle Investments LLC, Ami Roth, Jeff Roth, Randy Roth, Roth Family Inc., Roth Family Investments LLC, Roth Family Partnership LLP, Roth Farms LLC, Surfaces Inc., VGP LLC.(Artherton, Angela) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL State Court Pleadings Supplement from 39th Judicial Circuit Court, Stone County, Missouri County, case number 19SN-CC00050, filed by Angela C Artherton on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 6257969. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Supplement - Summonses, #2 State Court Pleadings Supplement - Affidavits of Service)(Artherton, Angela) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
April 6, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Certificate of Service by ADR Homes by Roth LLC, Commercial Homes by Roth LLC, Elite Eqiuty Group of Arkansas LLC, Elite Equity Group of Missouri LLC, MPRP, LLC, Mud Puddle Investments LLC, Ami Roth, Jeff Roth, Randy Roth, Roth Family Inc., Roth Family Investments LLC, Roth Family Partnership LLP, Roth Farms LLC, Surfaces Inc., VGP LLC. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Artherton, Angela) Modified on 4/8/2019 (Siegert, Karen). [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
April 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL State Court Pleadings Supplement from Stone County Circuit Court County, case number 19SN-CC00050, filed by Angela C Artherton on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6257969. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition)(Artherton, Angela) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
April 5, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 4/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca) Emailed to counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants. [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Stone County, Missouri County, case number 19SN-CC00050, filed by Angela C Artherton on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6257969. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Artherton, Angela) [Transferred from mowd on 7/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equity Bank v. Elite Equity Group of Missouri LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Equity Group of Missouri LLC
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roth Family, Inc.
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Roth
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Home Builders of Missouri
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surfaces Inc.
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Roth
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Builders of Missouri
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ami Roth
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGP LLC
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roth Custom Homes
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roth Family Investments LLC
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roth Family Partnership LLP
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Homes by Roth LLC
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roth Farms LLC
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mud Puddle Investments LLC
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPRP, LLC
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADR Homes By Roth, LLC
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Eqiuty Group of Arkansas LLC
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equity Bank
Represented By: Heidi V. Anderson
Represented By: John M. Molle
Represented By: Paul Salvatore Dominick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?