Downey v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Mark Downey and Estate of Virginia Downey
Defendant: CEO Doug McMillon, U.S. Attorney Richard W. Moore, William P Barr, United States Attorney General and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv05124
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER; Case dismissed without prejudice; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 15, 2019. (cnn) Modified on 8/16/2019 (src).
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER Directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to add as a Plaintiff the Estate of Virginia Downey. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 18, 2019. (smg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 12, 2019. (smg)
July 10, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Mark Downey. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(lgd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Mark Downey. (lgd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against William P Barr, United States Attorney General, Doug McMillon, Richard W. Moore, United States of America, filed by Mark Downey.(lgd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Mark Downey. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO Doug McMillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney Richard W. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr, United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Virginia Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?