Benton v. Morgan et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Carl Ray Benton
Defendant: Gregory Siemiller, John Morgan and Ryan Guffy
Case Number: 5:2019cv05125
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: James R Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 29, 2019. (lgd)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS unable to forward. Mail originally sent to Jesse Carl Ray Benton at Boone County Jail including #5 Case Transferred In - District Transfer and blank Complaint form. No new address available. (lgd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS Inmate Not Here. Mail originally sent to Jesse Carl Ray Benton at Boone County Jail including #7 Order Directing Pleading to be Filed and blank IFP. No new address available. New Address due by 8/21/2019. (lgd)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed IFP be filed. Completed IFP due by 7/29/2019. The Clerk is directed to put the application doc #1 under seal. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 10, 2019. (tg)
July 9, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Arkansas Eastern District. (lgd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished to plaintiff/petitioner. (lgd)
July 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jesse Carl Ray Benton. Motions referred to Honorable James R. Marschewski.(lgd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00436. Docket sheet received.
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer Mr. Morgan's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/9/2019. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 7/9/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jesse Carl Ray Benton re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Complaint. (fjg) [Transferred from ared on 7/9/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jesse Carl Ray Benton. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 7/9/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse Carl Ray Benton. (llg) [Transferred from ared on 7/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benton v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Carl Ray Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Siemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Guffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?