Tomelleri v. Hodgson

Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: Robert Hodgson
Case Number: 5:2019cv05132
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/30/2019. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 23, 2019. (jas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Robert Hodgson.(Haines, Seth)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver Peter Maguire on behalf of Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Maguire, Oliver)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Oliver Maguire is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. The requirement to designate local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 83.5(d) is waived for the limited purposes of this pending litigation. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 29, 2019. (jas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Oliver Maguire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1953937) by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Maguire, Oliver)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL REPORT ON THE FILING OF A COPYRIGHT ACTION for a case initiated by Joseph R. Tomelleri with the filing of #2 Complaint. (Strohm, Scott)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Scott J. Strohm appearing for Plaintiff. The requirement to designate local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 83.5(d) is waived for the limited purposes of this pending litigation. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 24, 2019. (jas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Scott J. Strohm to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1951599) by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Strohm, Scott)
July 18, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney(s) listed on Complaint #2 is (are) not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:Steven Mustoe, Scott Strohm, and Oliver Maguire. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (src)
July 17, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to attorney(s) filing a complaint or amended complaint in a Copyright action: Please complete AO Form 121 found on the Court's website (www.arwd.uscourts.gov -> ONLINE FORMS) and file it with the Court using Other Filings-Other Documents-Initial Report.Copyright/Patent/Trademark Report due 8/7/2019. (tg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Robert Hodgson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1947769), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri.(Gray, Travis)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Joseph R. Tomelleri. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: Travis Gray
Represented By: Scott Joseph Strohm
Represented By: Oliver Peter Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hodgson
Represented By: Seth M. Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?