Jordan v. John Autrey Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dean Jordan
Defendant: Tate Zimmerman, Taz, LLC, John Autrey Trucking, Inc. and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 5:2019cv05136
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/20/2019. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 14, 2019. (jas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by John Autrey Trucking, Inc., Tate Zimmerman.(Burns, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Party: re #12 Stipulation filed by Jennifer Dean Jordan. Party Taz, LLC Terminated. (src)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal of TAZ, LLC by Jennifer Dean Jordan. (Mulkey, Bruce)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #2 Complaint against All Defendants , filed by Jennifer Dean Jordan. Related document: #2 Complaint filed by Jennifer Dean Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit John Doe Affidavit)(Mulkey, Bruce)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Mulkey, Bruce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by John Autrey Trucking, Inc., Taz, LLC, Tate Zimmerman.(Burns, James)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed. Amended Complaint due by 8/9/2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 29, 2019. (tg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to John Autrey Trucking, Inc., Taz, LLC, Tate Zimmerman and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Tate Zimmerman for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Mulkey, Bruce)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to TAZ, LLC for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Mulkey, Bruce)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to John Autrey Trucking, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Mulkey, Bruce)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1949180), filed by Jennifer Dean Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit John Doe Affidavit)(Mulkey, Bruce)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jennifer Dean Jordan. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. John Autrey Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Zimmerman
Represented By: James D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taz, LLC
Represented By: James D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Autrey Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: James D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dean Jordan
Represented By: Bruce L. Mulkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?