Leato et al v. Horizon Bank et al
Plaintiff: Laurina T. Leato and John M. Leato
Defendant: Horizon Bank and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv05140
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to obey the order of the Court. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 10, 2019. (tg) Modified on 9/10/2019 to edit text(tg).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing that an Amended Complaint be filed. (Amended Complaint due by 8/27/2019). Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on August 6, 2019. (lgd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (tg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (tg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (tg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-10, inclusive, Horizon Bank, filed by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leato et al v. Horizon Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurina T. Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?