Lethas Pies, LLC et al v. Principis Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lethas Pies, LLC, Timothy Glenn and Rhonda Glenn
Defendant: John Does 1-10, John Does 11-20 and Principis Capital, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv05148
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 9/30/2019. (Dana Hayden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (slc)
September 26, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Principis Capital, LLC. (Marts, Gary)
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave. Principis Capital, LLC is directed to file its reply by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Friday, September 27, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 26, 2019. (jdw)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration by Principis Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply in support of its motion to compel arbitration)(Marts, Gary)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Principis Capital, LLC. (Berger, Eric)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Principis Capital, LLC. (Berger, Eric)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Rhonda Glenn, Timothy Glenn, Lethas Pies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hutchinson, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Initial Disclosures Pending Resolution of its Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Rhonda Glenn, Timothy Glenn, Lethas Pies, LLC. (Hutchinson, Timothy)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Initial Disclosures Pending Resolution of its Motion to Compel Arbitration by Principis Capital, LLC. (Marts, Gary)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Initial Disclosures Pending Resolution of its Motion to Compel Arbitration by Principis Capital, LLC. (Marts, Gary)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Principis Capital, LLC. (Marts, Gary)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Principis Capital, LLC. (Marts, Gary)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rhonda Glenn, Timothy Glenn, Lethas Pies, LLC. (Hutchinson, Timothy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 9/30/2019 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 15, 2019. (slc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Hendren on behalf of Principis Capital, LLC. (Hendren, Jason)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Berger on behalf of Principis Capital, LLC. (Berger, Eric)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Principis Capital, LLC.(Marts, Gary)
August 7, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading Notice of Removal, #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Eric Berger, Jason B. Hendren. (lgd)
August 6, 2019 Notice of Removal fee received: $ 400, receipt number 46105007067. (lgd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Does 1-10, John Does 11-20, Principis Capital, LLC, filed by Lethas Pies, LLC, Timothy Glenn, Rhonda Glenn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit of Service of State Complaint)(lgd)
August 6, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/8/2019 (lgd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John Does 1-10, John Does 11-20, Principis Capital, LLC. (lgd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 72CV-19-1688, filed by John Does 1-10, John Does 11-20, Principis Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to State Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to State Complaint, #4 Affidavit of Service of State Complaint)(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lethas Pies, LLC et al v. Principis Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lethas Pies, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Chad Hutchinson
Represented By: Matthew R. Bishop
Represented By: James Robert Renner
Represented By: Laurence M McCredy
Represented By: Seth M. Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Glenn
Represented By: Timothy Chad Hutchinson
Represented By: Matthew R. Bishop
Represented By: James Robert Renner
Represented By: Laurence M McCredy
Represented By: Seth M. Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Glenn
Represented By: Timothy Chad Hutchinson
Represented By: Matthew R. Bishop
Represented By: James Robert Renner
Represented By: Laurence M McCredy
Represented By: Seth M. Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jason B. Hendren
Represented By: Eric Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 11-20
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jason B. Hendren
Represented By: Eric Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principis Capital, LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jason B. Hendren
Represented By: Eric Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?