Brady v. Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Dr. Erin S. Brady
Defendant: Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv05150
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 30, 2019. (jas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. (Walters, Jason)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Randolph Charles Jackson on behalf of All Defendants. (Jackson, Randolph)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/30/2019. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 22, 2019. (jas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Dalton Person on behalf of Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. (Person, J. Dalton)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Honorable Timothy L. Brooks no longer assigned to the case. (slc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. (Walters, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America.(Walters, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1958785.. (Walters, Jason)
August 6, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/8/2019 (tg)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed in State Court with Jury Demand against Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America, filed by Erin S. Brady.(tg)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. (tg)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, Arkansas, case number 72CV-19-1597., filed by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 Proof of Service)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Erin S. Brady
Represented By: Matt L. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jason Allen Walters
Represented By: Randolph Charles Jackson
Represented By: J. Dalton Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?