Glaros v. Teachers Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Ann Glaros
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Teachers Credit Union
Case Number: 5:2019cv05151
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 10, 2019. (lgd) Modified on 9/10/2019 (lgd).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; and DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed.(Amended Complaint due by 8/28/2019). Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on August 7, 2019. (lgd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form mailed to Plaintiff. (lgd)
August 6, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Melissa Ann Glaros. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(lgd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Melissa Ann Glaros. (lgd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Melissa Ann Glaros. (lgd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-10, Teachers Credit Union, filed by Melissa Ann Glaros.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaros v. Teachers Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teachers Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Ann Glaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?