Jackson et al v. UMB Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Gail L. Jackson and Kevin M. Jackson
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services and UMB Bank National Association
Case Number: 5:2019cv05153
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER:Final Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 5/20/2020 09:00 AM before Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. BENCH TRIAL set for 5/26/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on October 9, 2019. (rg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rushmore Loan Management Services, UMB Bank National Association. (Stamatis, Teaven)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2019 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.Each party shall provide a concise, confidential settlement statement NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED CONFERENCE via email to ELWsettle@arwd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on October 1, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(rg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/30/2019. (Roxana Guerrero-Digital Recorder)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 210) (rg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 9/30/2019 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 2nd flr (Rm 213) before Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. NOTE: AT&T Conference Call information will be sent by email. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on September 30, 2019. (rg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 24, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment)(rg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to Terminate Defendant Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, as a party to the case pursuant to CMECF Doc. #1 Notice of Removal. An Order of Dismissal as to Defendant Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC was entered in State Court on August 7, 2019. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on September 24, 2019. (rg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 11/12/2019 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 22, 2019. (slc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint Answer also on behalf of UMB Bank National Association, a Foreign Banking Corporation as Trustee for TOCU Title Trust 2017-1 by Rushmore Loan Management Services.(Stamatis, Teaven)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Rushmore Loan Management Services served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Mayo, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint/Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. UMB Bank National Association served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Mayo, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint/Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Mayo, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint/Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Rushmore Loan Management Services served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Mayo, William)
August 14, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1962177.. (Stamatis, Teaven)
August 13, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE in Removal Case re Service of Process directing Plaintiffs Gail L. Jackson, Kevin M. Jackson to file affidavits of service (or copies of proof of service filed in state court) for defendant(s) who have already been served with summons and a copy of the complaint, and file proof of service in this court regarding defendant(s) to be served in the future. If service is not perfected on a defendant within 90 days after filing the complaint, a show cause order will issue and the complaint against that defendant is subject to dismissal pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) (src)
August 13, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Rushmore Loan Management Services. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Robert T Lieber. (src)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rushmore Loan Management Services. (src)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
August 13, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/15/2019 (src)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services, UMB Bank National Association, filed by Kevin M. Jackson, Gail L. Jackson.(src)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Rushmore Loan Management Services. (src)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, AR,, case number 72cv 19-01664., filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. UMB Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail L. Jackson
Represented By: William Richard Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin M. Jackson
Represented By: William Richard Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services
Represented By: Teaven James Stamatis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMB Bank National Association
Represented By: Teaven James Stamatis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?