Alorica Customer Care, Inc. v. Sam's West, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alorica Customer Care, Inc.
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05186
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading is December 9, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 22, 2019. (ee)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Sam's West, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's responsive pleading must be filed on or before NOVEMBER 25, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 22, 2019. (slc)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, by Sam's West, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge To Exercise Jurisdiction, Complaint and Petition to Compel Arbitration and Exhibits 1-3, filed by Alorica Customer Care, Inc.. Sam's West, Inc. served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Fortson, Grant)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Sam's West, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Sam's West, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Fortson, Grant)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION against Sam's West, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1991538), filed by Alorica Customer Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Fortson, Grant)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Alorica Customer Care, Inc. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alorica Customer Care, Inc. v. Sam's West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alorica Customer Care, Inc.
Represented By: Grant E. Fortson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Represented By: Karen P Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?