Baltz v. Lidestri Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharon Baltz
Defendant: Lidestri Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05193
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING: Case Management Hearing reset for 1/24/2020 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. NOTE: All deadlines set forth in the Initial Scheduling Order #12 remain. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 5, 2019. (slc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 1/15/2020 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 25, 2019. (slc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Lidestri Foods, Inc..(Madison, Eva)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to November 22, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 7, 2019. (ee)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lidestri Foods, Inc.. (Madison, Eva)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Lidestri Foods, Inc.. (Madison, Eva)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva C. Madison on behalf of Lidestri Foods, Inc.. (Madison, Eva)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Benson on behalf of Lidestri Foods, Inc.. (Benson, Margaret)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Lidestri Foods, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to LiDestri Foods, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Wood, Stephen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lidestri Foods, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1998303), filed by Sharon Baltz.(Wood, Stephen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Sharon Baltz. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baltz v. Lidestri Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lidestri Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Baltz
Represented By: Stephen Lee Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?