Goddard v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rick Goddard
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05211
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rick Goddard. (McClure, Melanie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 1/16/2020 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 15, 2019. (slc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.. (Smith, Jason)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc..(Smith, Jason)
November 12, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2013060.. (Smith, Jason)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., filed by Rick Goddard. Originally filed in Benton County Circuit Court on 10/3/19 (hnc) Modified on 11/8/2019 to add court information (hnc).
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.. (hnc)
November 8, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/12/2019 (hnc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Benton County Circuit Court, case number 04CV-19-2455., filed by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Affidavit of Mindy Morgan, #2 Exhibit 2: Pleadings)(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goddard v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Goddard
Represented By: Dylan J. Botteicher
Represented By: Melanie Jo McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?