Foreman v. Neece et al
Plaintiff: Kendall Allen Foreman
Defendant: Joel Neece, Dena Tripp, Shannon Neece, Pigtown Bakery, Inc. and Nothing Bundt Cakes
Case Number: 5:2019cv05215
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. MATTHEW S. DISBROW is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter; AND GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. MAHJA D. ZEON is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 6, 2020. (slc)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed MOTION for Attorney Mahja D. Zeon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2048749) by Dena Tripp. (Frye, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed MOTION for Attorney Matthew S. Disbrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2048701) by Dena Tripp. (Frye, William)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 Docket Annotation of Mailing: A copy of the Initial Scheduling Order #10 was mailed to non-ECF participant, Plaintiff Kendall Allen Foreman. (slc)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 2/11/2020 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 30, 2019. (slc)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint For Employment Discrimination by Joel Neece, Dean Tripp, Pigtown Bakery, Inc., Shannon Neece.(Frye, William) Modified filer information on 12/27/2019 (mfr).
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kendall Allen Foreman. Dena Tripp served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (tg)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kendall Allen Foreman. Pigtown Bakery, Inc. served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (tg)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kendall Allen Foreman. Joel Neece served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020; Shannon Neece served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020; Pigtown Bakery, Inc. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (lgd)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Joel Neece, Shannon Neece, Pigtown Bakery, Inc., Nothing Bundt Cakes and Dena Tripp and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #4 Order Directing Service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Joel Neece, Shannon Neece, Pigtown Bakery, Inc. and Dena Tripp and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on December 4, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(tg)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
November 21, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service filed by Kendall Allen Foreman. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(lgd)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Kendall Allen Foreman. (lgd) Modified on 12/23/2019 (lgd).
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joel Neece, Shannon Neece, Dena Tripp, Pigtown Bakery, Inc. filed by Kendall Allen Foreman.(lgd) Modified name on 11/22/2019 (lgd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foreman v. Neece et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Neece
Represented By: William Charles Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dena Tripp
Represented By: William Charles Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Neece
Represented By: William Charles Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pigtown Bakery, Inc.
Represented By: William Charles Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nothing Bundt Cakes
Represented By: William Charles Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Allen Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?