Tomelleri v. Sanders
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: Ben Sanders
Case Number: 5:2019cv05224
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to TRANSFER this case to the Hot Springs Division. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 26, 2019. (ee)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY by Joseph R. Tomelleri re 4 Order, . (Leffler, Matt)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE as to why venue should not be transferred to the Hot Springs Division. The show cause response must be filed by no later than December 23, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 9, 2019. (ee)
December 6, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to attorney(s) filing a complaint or amended complaint in a Copyright action: Please complete AO Form 121 found on the Court's website (www.arwd.uscourts.gov -> ONLINE FORMS) and file it with the Court using Other Filings-Other Documents-Initial Report.Copyright/Patent/Trademark Report due 12/27/2019. (tg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ben Sanders ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2032064), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri.(Leffler, Matt)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Joseph R. Tomelleri. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: Matt Ryan Leffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?