Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas v. Scott
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas
Defendant: John Scott, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05230
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by John Scott, Jr (Crone, Alan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/10/2020. Bench Trial set for 10/5/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 2, 2020. (jas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by John Scott, Jr.(Crone, Alan)
December 17, 2019 Notice of Removal fee received: $ 400, receipt number CARWDC-2038192. (tg)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Joseph Cordi, Jr on behalf of Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas. (Cordi, C.)
December 16, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (tg)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John Scott, Jr, filed by Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit employment agreement, #2 Exhibit Board Policy)(lgd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2019: #3 Exhibit state court case summons) (lgd).
December 13, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 12/16/2019 (lgd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John Scott, Jr. (lgd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 72CV-19-3008., filed by John Scott, Jr. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit Board Policy, #4 State case summons)(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas v. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Alan G. Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas
Represented By: Matthew Blayne McCoy
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?