Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC v. Premier IEC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Premier IEC, LLC and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv05016
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case: re #8 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC (CASE DISMISSED). (src)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulation of Dismissal by Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC. (Burks, Christopher) Modified text on 3/11/2020 (src).
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company's answer or response is due by March 25, 2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 21, 2020. (rab)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Wear, Justin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Premier IEC, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Premier IEC, LLC and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Second Defendant Summons)(Burks, Christopher)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Furnished. (tg)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Premier IEC, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2060260), filed by Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Burks, Christopher)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC v. Premier IEC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier IEC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?