Holiday v. Beckham
Plaintiff: Kiaunce Holiday
Defendant: Nurse Jon Beckham
Case Number: 5:2020cv05040
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached document for complete deadline information. Summary Judgment Motion due by 8/24/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 26, 2020. (djm)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Jon Beckham.(Thomas, JaNan)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiaunce Holiday. Jon Beckham served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (lgd)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS No longer at this facility. Mail originally sent to Kiauance Holiday at Washington County Jail including #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Kiaunce Holiday, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) filed by Kiaunce Holiday, #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983), Complaint 42:1983 - Initial. Resent to Osceola, AR. (tg)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address for Kiaunce Holiday. Documents that have previously been returned are being resent including #5 Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee. (lgd)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS not at facility. Mail originally sent to Kiaunce Holiday at Washington County Jail including #5 Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee,. No new address available. New Address due by 4/13/2020. (lgd)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jon Beckham and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #6 Order Directing Service, #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lgd)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Jon Beckham and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 3, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(lgd)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Sheriff, Washington County to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $29.74; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Washington County). (tg)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350; ORDER directing the Clerk to file the in forma pauperis (IFP) application and complaint submitted by the Plaintiff. A determination regarding his status as a pauper and service of process will be made at a later time. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of his new address. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on March 2, 2020. (lgd)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Kiaunce Holiday. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Jon Beckham, filed by Kiaunce Holiday.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holiday v. Beckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiaunce Holiday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jon Beckham
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?