Humphrey v. U.S. Trustee
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellant: LaDonna Humphrey
Appellee: Anthony Christopher and Absolute Pediatric Therapy
Case Number: 5:2020cv05048
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 Appellee's BRIEF by Absolute Pediatric Therapy, Anthony Christopher. Appellant Reply Brief due by 5/28/2020. (Ritter, Glenn)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Following communication between chambers staff and Attorneys Henson and Bond, the Court enters this order clarifying the record. Ms. Humphrey represents herself in her appeal to this Court, but Attorneys Henson and Bond continue to appear with respect to the underlying estate administration, and the Clerk is directed to keep them on the docket so that they may continue to receive notices of electronic filing in this case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 4, 2020. (rab)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #3 Motion to Dismiss Case. The docket does not reflect service of the Court's scheduling order on Plaintiff, who filed this case pro se, and failure to follow the order was the only basis for the motion to dismiss. The Clerk is directed to resend the #2 bankruptcy scheduling order to Plaintiff at her mailing address. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 4, 2020. (rab)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 Appellant's BRIEF by LaDonna Humphrey. Appellee Brief due by 5/15/2020. (src)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by LaDonna Humphrey. (lgd) Modified on 5/1/2020 (lgd).
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Absolute Pediatric Therapy, Anthony Christopher. (Ritter, Glenn)
March 18, 2020 TEXT ONLY BANKRUPTCY Transmittal Memorandum. The following Bankruptcy matter has been opened and the case number and judge assignment are as indicated: Bankruptcy Case number 5:19-bk-72555 has been opened as 5:20-cv-05048. The case has been assigned to Honorable Honorable P. K. Holmes III. (src)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order: Appellant Brief due by 4/6/2020, Appellee's Brief Due 14 days after service of Appellant's brief. Appellant's Reply Brief Due 14 days after service of Appellee's brief (src)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT by LaDonna Humphrey. Bankruptcy Court case number 5:19-bk-72555. File received. Appellant Brief due by 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Appeal, #3 12/4/19 Motion for Approval, #4 12/25/19 Response to Motion, #5 2/14/20 Order on Motion)(src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LaDonna Humphrey
Represented By: Stanley V. Bond
Represented By: Emily J. Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Anthony Christopher
Represented By: Glenn Scott Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Absolute Pediatric Therapy
Represented By: Glenn Scott Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?