Turley v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sallye Turley
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv05050
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATED RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines as set forth. Stipulated Record is due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 18, 2020. (jas)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company.(Price, Troy)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion. The deadline for Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company to answer or respond to the complaint is May 15, 2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 24, 2020. (rab)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Order Establishing Due Date for Responsive Pleading by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter acknowledging due date)(Price, Troy)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Price on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Price, Troy)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Sallye Turley. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. (Lacy, Brandon)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) (tg).
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,,. (Lacy, Brandon)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2106652), filed by Sallye Turley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Ltr from Anthem, #2 Exhibit 2, Clinical UM Guideline, #3 Exhibit 3, Ltr from Anthem, #4 Exhibit 4, Ltr from Turley, #5 Exhibit 5, Nurses Attempts, #6 Exhibit 6, External Review Determination, #7 Exhibit 7, Ltr from doctor, #8 Exhibit 8, Ltr from Anthem, #9 Exhibit 9, LLF ltr of rep, #10 Exhibit 10, LLF followup ltr)(Lacy, Brandon)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Sallye Turley. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turley v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sallye Turley
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Troy A. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?