Hill-Smith v. Silver Dollar Cabaret, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mya Hill-Smith
Defendant: Platinum Cabaret, LLC, Anthony K. Catroppa and Silver Dollar Cabaret, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv05051
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER. Defendants Silver Dollar Cabaret, Inc., Platinum Cabaret, LLC, and Anthony K. Catroppa are granted an extension of time, up to and including May 25, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff Mya Hill-Smith's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 22, 2020. (jdw)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Silver Dollar Cabaret, Inc. re #5 Summons Issued, Request for Extension to Respond. (Bernstein, Eric)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mya Hill-Smith. (Sanford, Josh)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Anthony K. Catroppa, Platinum Cabaret, LLC, Silver Dollar Cabaret, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Anthony F. Catroppa, Anthony K. Captroppa, Platinum Cabaret, LLC, and Silver Dollar Cabaret, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 MOTION Confirm Arbitration Award . (Sanford, Josh)
March 22, 2020 Complaint filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2106999.. (Sanford, Josh)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
March 20, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Civil Case filing fee . You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/23/2020 (tg)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Confirm Arbitration Award by Mya Hill-Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Partial Award, #2 Exhibit Final Award, #3 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement)(Sanford, Josh)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Mya Hill-Smith. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill-Smith v. Silver Dollar Cabaret, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum Cabaret, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony K. Catroppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Dollar Cabaret, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mya Hill-Smith
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?