Dyer v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Buffy Ann Dyer
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv05069
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Walmart Stores, Inc..(Jackson, Matthew)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 3, 2020. (tg)
June 1, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Jackson, Matthew)
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply. The reply attached to the Motion should be filed by no later than Tuesday, June 2, 2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 1, 2020. (ee)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jackson, Matthew)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Buffy Ann Dyer. (Wood, Stephen)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Buffy Ann Dyer. (Wood, Stephen)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 7/1/2020 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 20, 2020. (slc)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Knapp, Bailey)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Knapp, Bailey)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Knapp, Bailey)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bailey Knapp on behalf of Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Knapp, Bailey)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Scott Jackson on behalf of All Defendants. (Jackson, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Walmart Stores, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Walmart, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Wood, Stephen)
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Walmart Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2124774), filed by Buffy Ann Dyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Dyer to Most E-Mail, #2 Exhibit B -- Attorney Letter, #3 Exhibit C -- Walmart Policies, #4 Exhibit D -- Expungement Record, #5 Exhibit E -- Notice of Dismissal)(Wood, Stephen)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Buffy Ann Dyer. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyer v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buffy Ann Dyer
Represented By: Stephen Lee Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Represented By: Bailey Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?