Bailey v. Karas et al
Plaintiff: Michael Todd Bailey
Defendant: Nurse Chuck Dominguez, Nurse Jon Beckan, Dr. Robert Karas and Nurse Jon Beckam
Case Number: 5:2020cv05124
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on September 11, 2020. (lgd)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Todd Bailey. Nurse Jon Beckam served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020; Dr. Robert Karas served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (tg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS No longer at this facility. Mail originally sent to Michael Bailey at Washington County Jail including #9 Order Directing Service, #10 Summons Issued. Resent to Bentonville, AR. (tg)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed IFP be filed.( Completed IFP due by 9/4/2020). The Clerk is directed to strike the portion of document #5 directing the Clerk to collect the filing fee as Plaintiff is no longer incarcerated. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Weidemann on August 19, 2020. (tg) Modified on 8/19/2020 to edit text (tg).
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address for Michael Todd Bailey. There are no documents to resend. (lgd)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jon Beckam, Robert Karas and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #9 Order Directing Service, #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #7 Amended Complaint. (lgd)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Jon Beckam, Robert Karas and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on August 3, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(lgd)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER Directing the Clerk to change the style of the case and the case participant name to reflect the correct name of the Defendant as set forth in the #7 Amended Complaint. The name of Defendant Nurse Jon Beckan should be changed to Nurse Jon Beckam. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on August 3, 2020. (smg)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) against Jon Beckan, Robert Karas and Terminating Chuck Dominguez, filed by Michael Todd Bailey. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Michael Todd Bailey.(tg)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed. Amended Complaint due by 8/5/2020. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 20, 2020. (lgd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 ***STRICKEN PER TEXT ONLY ORDER DATED 8/19/2020*** CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Sheriff, Washington County to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $1.60; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Washington County). (tg) Modified on 8/19/2020 (tg).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Furnished. (tg)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the $350.00 filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 17, 2020. (tg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Michael Todd Bailey. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Jon Beckan, Chuck Dominguez, Robert Karas, filed by Michael Todd Bailey.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Karas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Todd Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Chuck Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jon Beckan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Robert Karas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jon Beckam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?