Barry et al v. State Farm Mutual Auomobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Barry and Don Barry
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv05131
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Runyon, Emily)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 10/2/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 31, 2020. (slc)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
July 29, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2188746.. (Runyon, Emily)
July 29, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/31/2020 (lgd)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (lgd)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(lgd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2020: #1 Exhibit A state farm policy) (lgd).
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Don Barry, Michelle Barry.(lgd)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (lgd)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit, case number 72CV-20-1497., filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Auomobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barry et al v. State Farm Mutual Auomobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Barry
Represented By: Erik P. Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Barry
Represented By: Erik P. Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Emily M. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Emily M. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?