Wendt v. Fayetteville School District No. 1
Plaintiff: Matthew A. Wendt
Defendant: Fayetteville School District No. 1 of Washington County, Arkansas
Case Number: 5:2020cv05150
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This amended complaint is now the operative complaint, and Defendant's motion to dismiss is moot. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 13, 2020. (elg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #2 Complaint, against Fayetteville School District No. 1 of Washington County, Arkansas , filed by Matthew A. Wendt. Related document: #2 Complaint, filed by Matthew A. Wendt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Story, Travis)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff may have an additional 7 days to respond to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 2, 2020. (elg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Matthew A. Wendt. (Payne, Gregory)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 11/30/2020 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 24, 2020. (slc)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Fayetteville School District No. 1 of Washington County, Arkansas. (Clark, Alexander)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Fayetteville School District No. 1 of Washington County, Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Clark, Alexander)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander D. Clark on behalf of All Defendants. (Clark, Alexander)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa McJunkins Duke on behalf of All Defendants. (Duke, Melissa)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Matthew A. Wendt. Fayetteville School District No. 1 of Washington County, Arkansas was sent waiver on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Payne, Gregory)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Fayetteville School District No. 1 of Washington County, Arkansas and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Fayetteville School District No. 1 for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Story, Travis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Fayetteville School District No. 1 of Washington County, Arkansas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2202867), filed by Matthew A. Wendt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended and Restated Superintendent Contract of Employment Dr. Wendt, #2 Exhibit Fayetteville School District Policies (4180), #3 Exhibit Second Amended and Restated Superintendent Contract of Employment (Colbert))(Story, Travis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Matthew A. Wendt. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wendt v. Fayetteville School District No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew A. Wendt
Represented By: Travis Wayne Story
Represented By: Gregory F. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayetteville School District No. 1 of Washington County, Arkansas
Represented By: Alexander D. Clark
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?