Miller et al v. Thurston
Plaintiff: Bonnie Heather Miller and League of Women Voters of Arkansas
Defendant: John Thurston
Case Number: 5:2020cv05163
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (See Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 15, 2020. (lgd)
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Motion Hearing held on 9/14/2020. (Paula Barden-Court Reporter) (slc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by League of Women Voters of Arkansas, Bonnie Heather Miller. (Lamar, Christopher)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Bronni on behalf of John Thurston. (Bronni, Nicholas)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file, by 5 p.m. today, a reply of no more than 5 pages addressing whether the harm to Plaintiffs is redressable by this Court given the arguments made by Defendant in sections B(1) and B(2) of his Response #16 . Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 11, 2020. (elg)
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Special Master's Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - SOS July 14 Letter re Open Primaries, #3 Exhibit 3 - SOS July 14 Letter re Redistricting, #4 Exhibit 4 - SOS Aug 11 Letter re Redistricting, #5 Exhibit 5 - SOS Aug 18 Letter re Open Primaries, #6 Exhibit 6 - Second Amd Original Action Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 - Redistricting Amendment, #8 Exhibit 8 - Open Primaries Amendment, #9 Exhibit 9 - Open Primaries Popular Name and Ballot Title, #10 Exhibit 10 - Special Master Hearing Transcript Day 1, #11 Exhibit 11 - Special Master Hearing Transcript Day 2, #12 Exhibit 12 - Special Master Hearing Transcript Day 3, #13 Exhibit 13 - Special Master Hearing Transcript Day 4, #14 Exhibit 14 - SBEC July 24 Letter re Non-Certification, #15 Exhibit 15 - Mary Claire McLaurin Declaration & ASP Form 122, #16 Exhibit 16 - SOS 2020 Initiatives & Referenda Handbook, #17 Exhibit 17 - League of Women Voters SOS Corporation Search, #18 Exhibit 18 - Peyton Murphy Declaration)(Cantrell, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent M. Wagner on behalf of John Thurston. (Wagner, Vincent)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Cantrell on behalf of John Thurston. (Cantrell, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #5 MOTION to Expedite Briefing (see Order for deadlines) AND Setting a Hearing on #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: MOTION HEARING (via Zoom) set for 9/14/2020 10:00 AM before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 4, 2020. (slc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to John Thurston and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to John Thurston, in his official capacity as Secretary of State of Arkansas for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Greenwood, Ruth)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. ***DISREGARD - REFILED AS DOC #11 *** Summons Requested as to John Thurston for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lamar, Christopher) Modified on 9/3/2020 (src).
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. CHRISTOPHER LAMAR appearing for PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 2, 2020. (slc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Christopher Lamar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2214252) by League of Women Voters of Arkansas, Bonnie Heather Miller. (Lamar, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by League of Women Voters of Arkansas, Bonnie Heather Miller. (Couch, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #5 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by League of Women Voters of Arkansas, Bonnie Heather Miller. (Couch, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by League of Women Voters of Arkansas, Bonnie Heather Miller. (Couch, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by League of Women Voters of Arkansas, Bonnie Heather Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Bonnie Heather Miller, #2 Exhibit B, Declaration of John M. Brooks, Jr., #3 Exhibit C, Declaration of Stephanie Robichaux Matthews)(Couch, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by League of Women Voters of Arkansas, Bonnie Heather Miller. (Couch, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bonnie Heather Miller, League of Women Voters of Arkansas.(Couch, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Bonnie Heather Miller. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)
September 2, 2020 Complaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2214456.. (Greenwood, Ruth)
September 2, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 9/4/2020 (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Heather Miller
Represented By: David A. Couch
Represented By: Christopher Lamar
Represented By: Ruth M. Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Arkansas
Represented By: David A. Couch
Represented By: Christopher Lamar
Represented By: Ruth M. Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Nicholas Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?