League of Women Voters of Arkansas et al v. Thurston et al
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Arkansas, Robert William Allen, John McNee and Aelica I. Orsi
Defendant: Bilenda Harris-Ritter, John Thurston, Charles Roberts, William Luther, Sharon Brooks, J. Harmon Smith and James Sharp
Case Number: 5:2020cv05174
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Cantrell, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave. Defendants are directed to file the reply attached as an exhibit to their motion. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 6, 2020. (rab)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Cantrell, Michael)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss / Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee, Aelica I. Orsi. (Couch, David)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER Denying #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (See Order for Specifics) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 26, 2020. (lgd)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston re #26 Response to Motion,, #27 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Richardson v. Texas Secy of State, No. 20-50774 (5th Cir. Oct. 19, 2020))(Cantrell, Michael)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction / Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee, Aelica I. Orsi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Susan Inman)(Couch, David)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston re #26 Response to Motion,, #27 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memphis A. Philip Randolph Inst. v. Hargett, No. 20-6046 (6th Cir. Oct. 15, 2020))(Cantrell, Michael)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ezra Rosenberg appearing as counsel for all Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 14, 2020. (jas)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney Ezra Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2248596) by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #27 MOTION to Dismiss by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Cantrell, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Executive Order 20-44, #2 Exhibit B-Executive Order 20-45, #3 Exhibit C-Absentee Canvassing Quick Guide, #4 Exhibit D-2020 CBEC Manual, #5 Exhibit E-2020 Processing Absentee Ballots Exercises, #6 Exhibit F-2020 SBEC Guidance re COVID-19, #7 Exhibit G-SOS 2020 Election Dates, #8 Exhibit H-2016 EAVS Arkansas Absentee Voter Data, #9 Exhibit I-2018 EAVS Arkansas Absentee Voter Data, #10 Exhibit J-Jonathan Davidson Declaration)(Cantrell, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Executive Order 20-44, #2 Exhibit B-Executive Order 20-45, #3 Exhibit C-Absentee Canvassing Quick Guide, #4 Exhibit D-2020 CBEC Manual, #5 Exhibit E-2020 Processing Absentee Ballots Exercises, #6 Exhibit F-2020 SBEC Guidance re COVID-19, #7 Exhibit G-SOS 2020 Election Dates, #8 Exhibit H-2016 EAVS Arkansas Absentee Voter Data, #9 Exhibit I-2018 EAVS Arkansas Absentee Voter Data, #10 Exhibit J-Jonathan Davidson Declaration)(Cantrell, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to file a reply to the forthcoming response. Plaintiffs' reply will be due by October 15, 2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 13, 2020. (rab)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee, Aelica I. Orsi. (Couch, David)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #14 Motion to expedite briefing. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 6, 2020. (tg)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #14 MOTION to Expedite Briefing re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Cantrell, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David W. Rivkin is now appearing for all Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 29, 2020. (jas)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney David W. Rivkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2234337) by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee, Aelica I. Orsi. (Rivkin, David)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of /Certificate of Service by David Couch filed by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee, Aelica I. Orsi re #11 Amended Complaint, #13 Memorandum Brief in Support,, #15 Memorandum Brief in Support, #14 MOTION to Expedite Briefing re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Couch, David)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Cantrell on behalf of All Defendants. (Cantrell, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Sharon Brooks served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; Bilenda Harris-Ritter served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; William Luther served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; Charles Roberts served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; James Sharp served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; J. Harmon Smith served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Couch, David)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. John Thurston served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Couch, David)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #14 MOTION to Expedite Briefing re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee, Aelica I. Orsi. (Couch, David)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Expedite Briefing re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee, Aelica I. Orsi. (Couch, David)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee, Aelica I. Orsi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Nell Matthews Mock, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Robert William Allen, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of John Robert McNee, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Aelica I. Orsi, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Susan Inman, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Dr. Linton A. Mohammed)(Couch, David)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee, Aelica I. Orsi. (Couch, David)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #2 Complaint, against Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston , filed by Robert William Allen, Aelica I. Orsi, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee. Related document: #2 Complaint, filed by John McNee, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, Robert William Allen.(Couch, David)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Julianne J. Marley is now appearing for all Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 28, 2020. (jas)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Julianne J. Marley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2232349) by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee. (Marley, Julianne)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John Michael Powers is now appearing for all Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 25, 2020. (rab)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney John Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2232122) by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee. (Powers, John)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to John Thurston, Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp and J. Harmon Smith for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons Requested to Sharon Brooks, #2 Summons Requested to Bilenda Harris-Ritter, #3 Summons Requested to J. Harmon Smith, #4 Summons Requested to William Luther, #5 Summons Requested to Charles Roberts, #6 Summons Requested to James Sharp)(Couch, David)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by League of Women Voters of Arkansas. (Couch, David)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2228876), filed by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee.(Couch, David)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Robert William Allen, League of Women Voters of Arkansas, John McNee. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: League of Women Voters of Arkansas et al v. Thurston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilenda Harris-Ritter
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Roberts
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Luther
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Brooks
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Harmon Smith
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sharp
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Arkansas
Represented By: David A. Couch
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: David W, Rivkin
Represented By: Julianne J. Marley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert William Allen
Represented By: David A. Couch
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: David W, Rivkin
Represented By: Julianne J. Marley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McNee
Represented By: David A. Couch
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: David W, Rivkin
Represented By: Julianne J. Marley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aelica I. Orsi
Represented By: David A. Couch
Represented By: David W, Rivkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?