Arkansas United et al v. Thurston et al
Plaintiff: Mireya Reith, Arkansas United and L. Mireya Reith
Defendant: Bilenda Harris-Ritter, Renee Oelschlaeger, John Thurston, William Luther, Luis Andrade, Max Deitchler, James Sharp, Charles Roberts, David Damron, Robbyn Tumey, Lee Webb, Sharon Brooks, J. Harmon Smith, Harlan Stee, Meghan Hassler, Bill Ackerman, Russell Anzalone and Jennifer Price
Case Number: 5:2020cv05193
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 95 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #82 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arkansas United, L. Mireya Reith. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 31, 2020 Filing 94 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arkansas United, L. Mireya Reith. Robbyn Tumey served on 12/26/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 31, 2020 Filing 93 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arkansas United, L. Mireya Reith. Russell Anzalone served on 12/26/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 31, 2020 Filing 92 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arkansas United, L. Mireya Reith. Harlan Stee served on 12/26/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 23, 2020 Filing 91 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Russell Anzalone, Harlan Stee, Robbyn Tumey and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src)
December 23, 2020 Filing 90 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Robbyn Tumey for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #77 Response to Motion, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #74 Response to Motion, #79 Amended Complaint,. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 23, 2020 Filing 89 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Russell Anzalone for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #77 Response to Motion, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #74 Response to Motion, #79 Amended Complaint,. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 23, 2020 Filing 88 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Harlan Stee for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #77 Response to Motion, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #74 Response to Motion, #79 Amended Complaint,. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 22, 2020 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion to Dismiss; or Alternatively to Stay Discovery and Certify Interlocutory Appeal by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Cantrell, Michael)
December 22, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; or Alternatively, to Stay Discovery and Certify Interlocutory Appeal by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Cantrell, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #84 MOTION to Dismiss by Russell Anzalone, Harlan Stee, Robbyn Tumey. (Owens, Jason)
December 21, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss by Russell Anzalone, Harlan Stee, Robbyn Tumey. (Owens, Jason)
December 17, 2020 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #82 MOTION to Dismiss by Luis Andrade, David Damron, Meghan Hassler, Lee Webb. (Owens, Jason)
December 17, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss by Luis Andrade, David Damron, Meghan Hassler, Lee Webb. (Owens, Jason)
December 14, 2020 Filing 81 TEXT ONLY ORDER. The Court dismisses as moot #57 #59 #61 #62 Motions to Dismiss in light of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. The Court grants in part and denies in part #80 Motion to Stay and modifies #75 Initial Scheduling Order as follows. The parties are directed to hold a Rule 26(f) Conference no later than January 8, 2021 and file a Rule 26(f) Report following the Court's form on or before January 22. However, all parties may wait to exchange initial disclosures and begin discovery until after the case management hearing, which remains set for February 9, 2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 14, 2020. (elg)
December 11, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Mosley, Michael)
December 8, 2020 Filing 79 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #2 Complaint against Bill Ackerman, Luis Andrade, Russell Anzalone, Sharon Brooks, David Damron, Max Deitchler, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, Meghan Hassler, William Luther, Renee Oelschlaeger, Jennifer Price, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, Harlan Stee, John Thurston, Robbyn Tumey, Lee Webb , filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Related document: #2 Complaint filed by Arkansas United.(Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 8, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Mosley on behalf of Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Mosley, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 77 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 3, 2020 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bill Ackerman, Max Deitchler, Renee Oelschlaeger, Jennifer Price. (Lester, Brian)
December 3, 2020 Filing 75 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 2/9/2021 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/13/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 3, 2020. (slc) (lgd).
December 3, 2020 Filing 74 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 2, 2020 Filing 73 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Luis Andrade served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 2, 2020 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Meghan Hassler served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 2, 2020 Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Lee Webb served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
December 2, 2020 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. David Damron served on 11/28/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 69 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Meghan Hassler and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
November 30, 2020 Filing 68 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Meghan Hassler for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 25, 2020 Filing 67 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Luis Andrade, David Damron, Lee Webb and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
November 25, 2020 Filing 66 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Lee Webb for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 25, 2020 Filing 65 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Luis Andrade for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 25, 2020 Filing 64 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to David Damron for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 25, 2020 TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY directed to Bill Ackerman, Max Deitchler, Renee Oelschlaeger, Jennifer Price: A #61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim was filed with the Court and appears to contain one or more deficiencies. The document appears to be deficient as follows: The motion is not accompanied by a separate brief in support as required by Local Rule 7.2(a). You are advised that the filing, while on the record, will not be considered unless and until all deficiencies are remedied. (src)
November 24, 2020 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #62 MOTION to Dismiss by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Cantrell, Michael)
November 24, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Cantrell, Michael)
November 24, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bill Ackerman, Max Deitchler, Renee Oelschlaeger, Jennifer Price. (Lester, Brian)
November 20, 2020 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Russell Anzalone, Harlan Stee, Robbyn Tumey. (Spence, George)
November 20, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Russell Anzalone, Harlan Stee, Robbyn Tumey. (Spence, George)
November 18, 2020 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Party by Luis Andrade, David Damron, Meghan Hassler, Lee Webb. (Shue, Charles)
November 18, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Party by Luis Andrade, David Damron, Meghan Hassler, Lee Webb. (Shue, Charles)
November 12, 2020 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Meghan Hassler served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Lee Webb served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Mireya Reith. David Damron served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Luis Andrade served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Renee Oelschlaeger served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Max Deitchler served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Jennifer Price served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Bill Ackerman served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Harlan Stee served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Russell Anzalone served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Robbyn Tumey served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. John Thurston served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. J. Harmon Smith served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. William Luther served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Sharon Brooks served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. James Sharp served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Charles Roberts served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, motion for TRO, and brief in support of TRO, filed by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Bilenda Harris-Ritter served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 5, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Francisco Fernandez del Castillo on behalf of Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. (Fernandez del Castillo, Francisco)
November 5, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Griselda Vega Vega Samuel on behalf of Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. (Vega Samuel, Griselda)
November 5, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Perales on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Perales, Nina)
November 3, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 3, 2020. (src)
November 3, 2020 Filing 34 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to All Defendants and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src)
November 3, 2020 Filing 33 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to William Luther for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 32 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Sharon Brooks for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 31 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Russell Anzalone for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 30 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Meghan Hassler for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 29 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Max Deitchler for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 28 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Lee Webb for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 27 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to John Thurston for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 26 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Jennifer Price for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 25 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to J. Harmon Smith for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 24 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to David Damron for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 23 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Charles Roberts for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 22 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Bilenda Harris-Ritter for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 21 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Robbyn Tumey for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 20 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Renee Oelschlaeger for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 19 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Luis Andrade for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 18 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to James Sharp for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Harlan Stee for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to B. Ackerman for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Walker, Lawrence)
November 3, 2020 Filing 15 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
November 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent M. Wagner on behalf of Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Wagner, Vincent)
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Bronni on behalf of Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Bronni, Nicholas)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Cantrell, Michael)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Cantrell on behalf of Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, James Sharp, J. Harmon Smith, John Thurston. (Cantrell, Michael)
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Francisco Fernandez-del Castillo is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 3, 2020. (jas)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Griselda Vega Samuel is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 3, 2020. (jas)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nina Perales is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 3, 2020. (jas)
November 3, 2020 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Honorable P. K. Holmes III no longer assigned to the case. (lw)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2263688) by Arkansas United. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Walker, Lawrence)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2263686) by Arkansas United. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Walker, Lawrence)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2263684) by Arkansas United. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Walker, Lawrence)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #3 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Arkansas United. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF L. MIREYA REITH)(Walker, Lawrence)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Arkansas United. (Walker, Lawrence)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CARWDC-2263621), filed by Arkansas United.(Walker, Lawrence)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Arkansas United, Mireya Reith. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas United et al v. Thurston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilenda Harris-Ritter
Represented By: Michael A. Mosley
Represented By: Nicholas Bronni
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Oelschlaeger
Represented By: Brian R. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Michael A. Mosley
Represented By: Nicholas Bronni
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Luther
Represented By: Michael A. Mosley
Represented By: Nicholas Bronni
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Andrade
Represented By: Charles Daniel Shue, Jr.
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Deitchler
Represented By: Brian R. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sharp
Represented By: Michael A. Mosley
Represented By: Nicholas Bronni
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Roberts
Represented By: Michael A. Mosley
Represented By: Nicholas Bronni
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Damron
Represented By: Charles Daniel Shue, Jr.
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbyn Tumey
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Represented By: George Ray Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Webb
Represented By: Charles Daniel Shue, Jr.
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Brooks
Represented By: Michael A. Mosley
Represented By: Nicholas Bronni
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Harmon Smith
Represented By: Michael A. Mosley
Represented By: Nicholas Bronni
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harlan Stee
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Represented By: George Ray Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meghan Hassler
Represented By: Charles Daniel Shue, Jr.
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Ackerman
Represented By: Brian R. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Anzalone
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Represented By: George Ray Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Price
Represented By: Brian R. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mireya Reith
Represented By: Lawrence Anthony Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas United
Represented By: Lawrence Anthony Walker
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Griselda Vega Vega Samuel
Represented By: Francisco Fernandez del Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Mireya Reith
Represented By: Lawrence Anthony Walker
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Griselda Vega Vega Samuel
Represented By: Francisco Fernandez del Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?