Boykin v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Meisha Boykin
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2021cv05007
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Meisha Boykin. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 1/15/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Letters and Return Receipts)(Thurman, Greg)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Andrew Saul Commissioner of Social Security, Attorney General of the U.S., U.S. Attorney for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Thurman, Greg)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Meisha Boykin. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Thurman, Greg)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(tg)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2309756), filed by Meisha Boykin.(Thurman, Greg)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Meisha Boykin. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boykin v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meisha Boykin
Represented By: Greg Allen Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?