Malexius v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Richards A. Malexius and Malexius A. Richards
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2021cv05087
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Christy D Comstock
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable P. K. Holmes III and Honorable Christy D. Comstock, as the referral judge. (lgd)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on May 14, 2021. (tg)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Service, MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Malexius A. Richards. (McKinnon, Laura)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Saul, Commr SSA and USAtty and Atty Genl Garland for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (McKinnon, Laura)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 5/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(tg)
May 13, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/17/2021 (tg)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Malexius A. Richards.(McKinnon, Laura) Modified on 5/13/2021 (tg).
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Malexius A. Richards. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malexius v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richards A. Malexius
Represented By: Laura J. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malexius A. Richards
Represented By: Laura J. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?