Hews Ark, LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hews Ark, LLC
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv05090
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial remains set for 5/2/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 30, 2021. (jas)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Hews Ark, LLC. (Curnutt, Kelly)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Jones, Jamie) Modified document title on 6/7/2021 (jas).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ***DISREGARD ENTRY- REFILED AS DOC #19 ***ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Jones, Jamie) Modified on 6/4/2021 (src).
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hews Ark, LLC. Amendment to #3 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Wales, Jason) Modified text on 6/1/2021 (lgd). Modified on 6/2/2021 (src).
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #17 Amended Complaint against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Hews Ark, LLC. FILED FOR ECF PURPOSES ONLY TO LINK ANSWER (lgd)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David Petter on behalf of Hews Ark, LLC. (Petter, David)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Curnutt on behalf of Hews Ark, LLC. (Curnutt, Kelly)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 25, 2021. (jas)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kelly J. Curnutt is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 25, 2021. (jas)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David G. Petter is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 25, 2021. (jas)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Jones, Jamie) Modified docket title on 5/25/2021 (jas).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Kelly J. Curnutt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2396654) by Hews Ark, LLC. (Wales, Jason)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney David G. Petter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2396644) by Hews Ark, LLC. (Wales, Jason)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Jones, Jamie) Modified on 5/25/2021 to add text (cnn).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Jones, Jamie) Modified on 5/25/2021 to add text (cnn).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Defendant to show cause why this case should not be remanded by supplementing the notice of removal. Show Cause Response due by 5/27/2021. (See Order for Specifics) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 20, 2021. (lgd)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Huffman Jones on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Jones, Jamie)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2394271.. (Campbell, Katherine)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Hews Ark, LLC.(tg) Modified on 5/19/2021 (tg). (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/25/2021) (hnc).
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (tg)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, case number 72CV-21-900, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(tg)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: JAMIE JONES. (tg)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/21/2021 (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hews Ark, LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hews Ark, LLC
Represented By: Jason H Wales
Represented By: Kelly Curnutt
Represented By: David Petter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?