Powers v. Westwood
Plaintiff: Laura Powers
Defendant: Reliance Health Care, Inc. doing business as Westwood Health and Rehab, Westwood name changed per Text Order #10 doing business as Westwood Health and Rehabilitation, Inc. formerly known as Reliance Healthcare and Reliance Healthcare
Case Number: 5:2021cv05094
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 5/26/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Each party shall provide a concise, confidential settlement statement NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED CONFERENCE via email to CDCsettle@arwd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on July 20, 2021. (rg)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. JURY TRIAL set for 7/18/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 20, 2021. (slc)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER noting that during the case management hearing today, the parties agreed that the defendant in this case was misidentified. The name of the proper defendant in this case is Westwood d/b/a Westwood Health and Rehabilitation, Inc. The appropriate defendant is not Reliance Healthcare. Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to substitute the proper defendant, Westwood d/b/a Westwood Health and Rehabilitation, Inc., for the currently named defendant, Reliance Healthcare. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 15, 2021. (ee)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 7/15/2021. (Paula Barden-Court Reporter) (slc)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Reliance Health Care, Inc.. (Campbell, Phil)
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reliance Health Care, Inc.. (Campbell, Phil)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 7/15/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 1, 2021. (slc)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Reliance Health Care, Inc..(Campbell, Phil)
May 27, 2021 Notice of Removal fee received: $ 402, receipt number AARWDC 2397437. (lgd)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Reliance Health Care, Inc., exhibits and summons, filed by Laura Powers.(lgd)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 72CV-21-829., filed by Reliance Health Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court documents)(lgd)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Reliance Health Care, Inc. (lgd)
May 25, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Reliance Health Care, Inc.. Notice of Removal #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Chris Stevens. (lgd)
May 25, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/27/2021 (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. Westwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Powers
Represented By: Courtney Alexa Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Health Care, Inc. doing business as Westwood Health and Rehab
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westwood name changed per Text Order #10 doing business as Westwood Health and Rehabilitation, Inc. formerly known as Reliance Healthcare
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Healthcare
Represented By: Phil W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?