Robinson v. Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tambra M. Robinson
Defendant: Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv05142
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc..(Woods, Rick)
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 7/25/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 10, 2021. (jas) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/21/2021) (jlm).
September 9, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Tambra M. Robinson. (Wood, Stephen) (Main Document 16 replaced on 9/21/2021) (jlm).
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc.. (Woods, Rick)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 OPINION AND ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 9, 2021. (tg) Modified on 9/13/2021 (tg).
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #11 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Tambra M. Robinson. (Wood, Stephen)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #11 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Tambra M. Robinson. (Wood, Stephen)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tambra M. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Declaration of Tambra M. Robinson)(Wood, Stephen)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/4/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/25/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 26, 2021. (jas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc.. (Woods, Rick)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc.. (Woods, Rick)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tambra M. Robinson. Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc. (Tim Lewis) served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (tg)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD DUPLICATE ENTRY*** THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg) Modified on 8/4/2021 (tg).
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Wood, Stephen)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc., filed by Tambra M. Robinson.(Wood, Stephen)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Tambra M. Robinson. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)
August 4, 2021 Complaint filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, #2 Complaint : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2438097.. (Wood, Stephen)
August 4, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/6/2021 (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tambra M. Robinson
Represented By: Stephen Lee Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Chrysler-Dodge, Inc.
Represented By: Rick Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?