Northcutt et al v. Berhe et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Northcutt and Natalie Northcutt
Defendant: Yosef T. Berhe, Biserat Zegai and Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv05178
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 16 Defendants Berhe and Zegai's ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Yosef T. Berhe, Biserat Zegai.(lgd) Modified on 12/3/2021 (lgd).
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Yosef T. Berhe served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021; Biserat Zegai served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. (Lewis, Todd)
November 17, 2021 Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 2/2/2022 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 17, 2021. (slc)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weichert No Representation Disclosure Statement)(Hopkins, Adam)
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Yosef T. Berhe, Biserat Zegai and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Biserat Zegai for service of the following document: #4 Complaint. (Lewis, Todd)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Yosef T. Berhe for service of the following document: #4 Complaint. (Lewis, Todd)
November 4, 2021 TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY directed to Curtis Northcutt, Natalie Northcutt: A #8 Summons Returned Executed, #9 Summons Returned Executed was filed with the Court and appears to contain one or more deficiencies. The document appears to be deficient as follows: State Summons form (with state answer deadlines) served upon defendants after case was removed from state court to U.S. District Court. You are advised that the filing, while on the record, will not be considered unless and until all deficiencies are remedied. (src)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Biserat Zegai served on 10/9/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Lewis, Todd)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Yosef T. Berhe served on 10/9/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Lewis, Todd)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Curtis Northcutt, Natalie Northcutt. (Lewis, Todd)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.'s Answer is now due no later than 11/12/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 14, 2021. (jld)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint by Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.. (Hopkins, Adam)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Yosef T. Berhe, Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc., Biserat Zegai, filed by Curtis Northcutt, Natalie Northcutt.(tg)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc. (tg)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Benton County, case number 04CV-21-2044, filed by Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.(tg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2021: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint) (tg).
October 7, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (tg)
October 7, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2472886.. (Hopkins, Adam)
October 7, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 10/12/2021 (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northcutt et al v. Berhe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Northcutt
Represented By: Ethan Spenser Ellis
Represented By: Todd P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Northcutt
Represented By: Ethan Spenser Ellis
Represented By: Todd P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yosef T. Berhe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biserat Zegai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weichert Workforce Mobility Inc.
Represented By: Adam L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?