Doe v. University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, et al
Plaintiff: Joan Doe
Defendant: University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, University of Arkansas School of Law, Board of Trustees for the University of Arkansas, Donald Bobbitt, Arkansas Board of Higher Education and Arkansas Board of Law Examiners
Case Number: 5:2021cv05231
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #33 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Board of Trustees for the University of Arkansas, Donald Bobbitt, University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, University of Arkansas School of Law. (Cordi, C.)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.NOTICE OF FILING AN UNREDACTED DOCUMENT by Board of Trustees for the University of Arkansas, Donald Bobbitt, University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, University of Arkansas School of Law. The redacted document was previously filed as #33 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit Ex. C (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit Ex. D (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit Ex. E (Filed Under Seal)) (Cordi, C.)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Board of Trustees for the University of Arkansas, Donald Bobbitt, University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, University of Arkansas School of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (Redacted), #3 Exhibit Ex. C (Redacted), #4 Exhibit Ex. D (Redacted), #5 Exhibit Ex. E (Redacted))(Cordi, C.)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Joseph Cordi, Jr on behalf of Board of Trustees for the University of Arkansas, Donald Bobbitt, University of Arkansas School of Law. (Cordi, C.)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Certificate of Service by Joan Doe (src)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Perry France on behalf of Arkansas Board of Higher Education. (France, Vincent)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER terminating as moot #8 MOTION EX PARTE; terminating as moot #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; terminating as moot #13 MOTION EX PARTE and terminating as moot #22 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (see Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 8, 2022. (tg) Modified on 2/8/2022 to edit text (tg).
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Perry France on behalf of Arkansas Board of Law Examiners. (France, Vincent)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Arkansas Board of Higher Education, Arkansas Board of Law Examiners and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (tg) (tg).
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #1 Complaint against Arkansas Board of Law Examiners, Donald Bobbitt, Board of Trustees for the University of Arkansas, Arkansas Board of Higher Education, University of Arkansas School of Law, University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, filed by Joan Doe. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Joan Doe. (Attachments: #1 DOJ Letter, #2 Application for Med License, #3 Ark Rule Student Lawyer, #4 Bar Application, #5 UA Financial Statement, #6 Largest Law Firms, #7 Ark. Vendor Contracts, #8 UA Parking)(src)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER granting #24 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to immediately file the amended complaint attached as an exhibit to her motion. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 7, 2022. (tg)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #23 Amended Complaint,, by Joan Doe. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint, #2 DOJ Letter, #3 Application for Med License, #4 Ark Rule Student Lawyer, #5 Bar Application, #6 UA Financial Statement, #7 Largest Law Firms, #8 Ark. Vendor Contracts, #9 UA Parking)(src)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ***Filed without legal effect***AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #1 Complaint against Arkansas Board of Law Examiners, Donald Bobbitt, Board of Trustees for the University of Arkansas, Arkansas Board of Higher Education, University of Arkansas School of Law, University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, filed by Joan Doe. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Joan Doe. (Attachments: #1 DOJ Letter, #2 Ark Rule Student Lawyer, #3 Application to the Bar, #4 Largest Law Firms, #5 Certificate of Service)(src) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2022: #6 AR State Contracts, #7 US Financial Statement, #8 Arkansas MD Application) (src). Added additional attachments on 2/7/2022 due to PDF upload issue (src). Modified on 2/7/2022 (src).
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment re #8 #13 Motions for Preliminary Injuctive Relief and TRO by Joan Doe. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(src)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,for insufficient service, and for sovereign immunity filed by Joan Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 12 redacted, #2 Exhibit Exh 13 redacted, #3 Exhibit Exh 14 redacted, #4 Exhibit Exh 17 redacted email, #5 Exhibit Exh 18, #6 Exhibit Exh 20 redacted phone record, #7 Exh 21, #8 Exh 22, #9 Exh 25, #10 Certificate of service)(lgd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2022: #11 unredacted exhibit 12, #12 unredacted exh 13, #13 unredacted exh 14, #14 Unredacted Exh 17, #15 unredacted Exh 20, #16 unredacted Exh 2) (lgd). Modified to grant applicable access on 1/28/2022 (lgd).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Certificates of Service of Plaintiff's Motion for Waiver of Service; Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and for leave to amend by Joan Doe. (lgd)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION AND ORDER denying #16 Motion for Reconsideration, #17 Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Leave to Amend and #18 Motion for waiver of service. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 24, 2022. (tg) Modified on 1/24/2022 to add text(tg).
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM and MOTION for an ORDER for Waiver of Service by Joan Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 REDACTED, #2 Exhibit 14 REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 17 REDACTED, #4 Exhibit 20 REDACTED)(tg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2022: #5 UNREDACTED Exhibit 11, #6 UNREDACTED Exhibit 14, #7 UNREDACTED Exhibit 17, #8 UNREDACTED Exhibit 20) (tg).
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Reconsideration and Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant's Name re #15 Order on Motion Ex Parte, Memorandum Opinion and Order by Joan Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15, #2 Exhibit 16)(tg)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Reconsideration of this Court's Order regarding Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order re #15 Order on Motion Ex Parte, Memorandum Opinion and Order, by Joan Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 REDACTED, #2 Exhibit 11 REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 12 REDACTED, #4 Exhibit 13 REDACTED, #5 Exhibit 14 REDACTED)(tg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2022: #6 UNREDACTED Exhibit 10, #7 UNREDACTED Exhibit 11, #8 UNREDACTED Exhibit 12, #9 UNREDACTED Exhibit 13, #10 UNREDACTED Exhibit 14) (tg).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER regarding (Doc. 13) Motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is DENIED IN PART. A ruling on Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction will be deferred until the proper Defendants have had the opportunity to respond. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 18, 2022. (tg) Modified on 1/18/2022 (tg).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR EMERGENCY EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by J. Doe. (tg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2022: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (tg).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR EMERGENCY EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by J. Doe. (tg) (tg)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,for insufficient service, and for sovereign immunity by University of Arkansas - Fayetteville. (Cordi, C.)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,for insufficient service, and for sovereign immunity by University of Arkansas - Fayetteville. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Cordi, C.)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Joseph Cordi, Jr on behalf of University of Arkansas - Fayetteville. (Cordi, C.)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT #8 Motion for Ex Parte by J Doe. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9) (tg) Modified access on 1/13/2022 (src). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2022: #11 Exhibit 10) (tg).
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION FOR EX PARTE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by J. Doe. (tg) Modified access on 1/13/2022 (src).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joan Doe. University of Arkansas - Fayetteville served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/24/2022. (tg) Modified on 1/10/2022 (lgd).
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 MOTION to Proceed Using a Pseudonym MOTION for Protective Order and #1 Complaint filed by Joan Doe (see Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on December 27, 2021. (tg)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***DISREGARD- DUPLICATE ENTRY*** Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src) Modified on 12/23/2021 (src).
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to University of Arkansas - Fayetteville and returned to plaintiff via e-mail for service. (src)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Furnished. (tg)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Using a Pseudonuym and MOTION for Protective Order by Joan Doe. (src) (Additional attachment added Under Seal on 12/23/2021: #1 Complaint) (src). Modified on 12/23/2021 (src). Modified to grant access on 1/14/2022 (lgd).
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University of Arkansas - Fayetteville ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5007514), filed by Joan Doe.(src) Modified to grant access on 1/14/2022 (lgd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas - Fayetteville
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas School of Law
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees for the University of Arkansas
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Bobbitt
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Board of Higher Education
Represented By: Vincent Perry France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Board of Law Examiners
Represented By: Vincent Perry France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?