Corrales et al v. Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Iris Corrales and Elaine Hopkins
Defendant: Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Simmons Foods, Inc. and Simmons Feed Ingredients, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv05235
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #23 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Simmons Feed Ingredients, Inc., Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jamie Thieman, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Dispute Resolution Program, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Email, #4 Exhibit A-3 - Email, #5 Exhibit A-4 - Email, #6 Exhibit A-5 - Email, #7 Exhibit A-6 - Email, #8 Exhibit A-7 - Email, #9 Exhibit B - Declaration of Talley Parker, #10 Exhibit B-1 - Email, #11 Exhibit B-2 - Email, #12 Exhibit B-3 - Email, #13 Exhibit B-4 - Email, #14 Exhibit B-5 - Email)(Parker, Talley)
February 25, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Simmons Feed Ingredients, Inc., Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Parker, Talley)
February 17, 2022 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simmons Feed Ingredients, Inc., Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Parker, Talley)
February 17, 2022 Filing 21 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, by Simmons Feed Ingredients, Inc., Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc..(Parker, Talley)
February 14, 2022 Filing 20 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 4/12/2022 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/21/2022. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 14, 2022. (slc)
January 25, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, by Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc..(Parker, Talley)
January 14, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William Marshall Prettyman, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Prettyman, William)
January 13, 2022 Filing 17 ***PLEASE DISREGARD*** Will be refiled- NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Samara Schuldt on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Schuldt, Renee) Modified text on 1/14/2022 (lgd).
January 12, 2022 Filing 16 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Simmons Feed Ingredients, Inc., Simmons Foods, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
January 12, 2022 Filing 15 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Simmons Feed Ingredients, Inc. for service of the following document: #13 Amended Complaint,. (Schuldt, Renee)
January 12, 2022 Filing 14 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Simmons Foods Inc. for service of the following document: #13 Amended Complaint,. (Schuldt, Renee)
January 11, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #4 Complaint against Simmons Feed Ingredients, Inc., Simmons Foods, Inc., Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc. , filed by Iris Corrales, Elaine Hopkins. Related document: #4 Complaint filed by Elaine Hopkins, Iris Corrales.(Schuldt, Renee)
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan J. Davis on behalf of Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Davis, Ethan)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc..(Parker, Talley)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Talley Parker on behalf of Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Parker, Talley)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ETHAN J. DAVIS is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 5, 2022. (slc)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. TALLEY R. PARKER is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 5, 2022. (slc)
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Ethan J. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2519676) by Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Kobbeman, Kerri)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Talley R. Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2519670) by Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Kobbeman, Kerri)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Kobbeman, Kerri)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., filed by Iris Corrales, Elaine Hopkins.(tg)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc. (tg)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Benton County, case number 04-CV-21-2788., filed by Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., an Arkansas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3)(tg) Modified on 12/29/2021 to edit text (tg).
December 29, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 1/3/2022 (tg)
December 29, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2516844.. (Kobbeman, Kerri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corrales et al v. Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Corrales
Represented By: Renee Samara Schuldt
Represented By: William Marshall Prettyman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Hopkins
Represented By: Renee Samara Schuldt
Represented By: William Marshall Prettyman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Kerri E. Kobbeman
Represented By: Talley Parker
Represented By: Ethan J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Talley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons Feed Ingredients, Inc.
Represented By: Talley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?