Williams v. Pineda et al
Plaintiff: Tyrece Williams
Defendant: Sergeant Pineda, Corporal Myatt and Corporal Sena
Case Number: 5:2022cv05047
Filed: March 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Christy D Comstock
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Myatt served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022; Pineda served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022; Sena served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (bjb)
April 26, 2022 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached document for complete deadline information. Summary Judgment Motion due by 9/23/2022. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on April 26, 2022. (rg)
April 20, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Myatt, Pineda, Sena.(Thomas, JaNan)
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Myatt, Pineda, Sena and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #6 Order Directing Service, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Myatt, Pineda, Sena and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on March 21, 2022. (tg)
March 10, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Sheriff, Washington County to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Washington County). (tg)
March 10, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Furnished. (tg)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the $350.00 filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on March 10, 2022. (tg) (lgd).
March 10, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Tyrece Williams. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(tg)
March 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Myatt, Pineda, Sena, filed by Tyrece Williams.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Pineda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrece Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Pineda
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Myatt
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Sena
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?