Lee v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Katonia Lee
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2022cv05075
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Katonia Lee. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company was sent waiver on 4/27/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (McNamara, John)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. J. PRICE McNAMARA appearing for PLAINTIFF. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 20, 2022. (slc)
April 19, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney J. Price McNamara to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2578570) by Katonia Lee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNamara, John)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2578564), filed by Katonia Lee.(McNamara, John)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Katonia Lee. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katonia Lee
Represented By: John Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?