RWP Associates, LLC d/b/a Price Associates, P.A. v. World Tech Toys, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RWP Associates, LLC d/b/a Price Associates, P.A.
Defendant: World Tech Toys, Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 5:2022cv05117
Filed: June 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 9/7/2022 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/29/2022. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 22, 2022. (slc)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Amended Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is now due no later than August 1, 2022. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 19, 2022. (glk)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF Motion re #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 Notice (Other), with Exhibits A and B filed by World Tech Toys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tony J. Cheng in support of WTT's Response)(Cheng, Tony)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing Defendant World Tech Toys, Inc. to file its opposition, if any, to Plaintiff's #13 Amended Motion for Extension of Time to File Response by end of day July 19, 2022. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 18, 2022. (glk)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response due to the filing of #13 Amended Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 18, 2022. (glk)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 Notice (Other), with Exhibits A and B by RWP Associates, LLC d/b/a Price Associates, P.A.. (Vereen, William)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 Notice (Other), with Exhibits A and B by RWP Associates, LLC d/b/a Price Associates, P.A.. (Vereen, William)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Spencer Vereen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Vereen, William)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by World Tech Toys, Inc. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Request for Judicial Notice in support of Defendant World Tech Toys, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cheng, Tony)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by World Tech Toys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of WTT's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of K. Kouyoumjian)(Cheng, Tony)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony J Cheng on behalf of World Tech Toys, Inc.. (Cheng, Tony)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. TONY J. CHENG appearing for DEFENDANT. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 29, 2022. (slc)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Tony J. Cheng to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2615852) by World Tech Toys, Inc.. (Cheng, Tony)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2612556.. (Hendren, Jason)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Nicole Hall on behalf of World Tech Toys, Inc.. (Hall, Amber)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Does 1-10, World Tech Toys, Inc., filed by RWP Associates, LLC d/b/a Price Associates, P.A.(tg)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by World Tech Toys, Inc. (tg)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, case number 72CV-22-969., filed by World Tech Toys, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint)(tg)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/24/2022 (tg)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant World Tech Toys, Inc. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Amber Sanders. (tg)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney(s) listed on Complaint #4 is not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:Spencer Vereen. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RWP Associates, LLC d/b/a Price Associates, P.A. v. World Tech Toys, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RWP Associates, LLC d/b/a Price Associates, P.A.
Represented By: Spencer Vereen
Represented By: William Spencer Vereen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Tech Toys, Inc.
Represented By: Amber Nicole Hall
Represented By: Jason B. Hendren
Represented By: Tony J Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?