Farella v. Benton County District Court, DIV.4
Plaintiff: Abigail Farella and Logan W. Murphy
Defendant: Benton County District Court, DIV. 4 and District Judge A.J. Anglin
Case Number: 5:2022cv05121
Filed: June 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to A.J. Anglin, Benton County District Court, DIV. 4 and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb)
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to DISTRICT JUDGE A.J.ANGLIN for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Norwood, Norman)
June 28, 2022 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to BENTON COUNTY DISTRICT COURT, Division 4 for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Norwood, Norman)
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. ***DISREGARD*** Summons Requested as to BENTON COUNTY DISTRICT 4 JUDGE A.J. Anglin for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Norwood, Norman) Modified on 6/28/2022 (bjb).
June 27, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/28/2022) (bjb).
June 27, 2022 Complaint fee received: $ 402, receipt number 5007613. (tg)
June 24, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Abigail Farella and Logan W. Murphy, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated against A.J. Anglin, Benton County District Court, DIV. 4, filed by Abigail Farella, Logan W. Murphy.(Norwood, Norman)
June 24, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Abigail Farella, Logan W. Murphy. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tg)
June 24, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/27/2022 (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farella v. Benton County District Court, DIV.4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Farella
Represented By: Norman Douglas Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan W. Murphy
Represented By: Norman Douglas Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County District Court, DIV. 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Judge A.J. Anglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?