Meraz v. Cantrell et al
Plaintiff: Jerome M Meraz
Defendant: Sheriff Jay Cantrell, Captain Nolan, Corporal Tom Mulvaney, Corporal Corley, Jailer Camron Stout, Ex-Sheriff Hurley, Corporal Dominick Nunziato, Corporal Benjamin Velasco, Corporal Christopher Drumwright, Sergeant Randell Fuller, Washington County Jail, John or Jane Doe Dietician and John or Jane Doe Kitchen Supervisor
Case Number: 5:2023cv05044
Filed: March 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Christy D Comstock
2 Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2023 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS Unable to forward. Mail originally sent to Jerome Meraz at Malvern, AR including #11 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Jerome M Meraz, #10 Amended Complaint filed by Jerome M Meraz. Resent to Delta Unit. (tg)
May 5, 2023 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS Unable to forward. Mail originally sent to Jerome Meraz at Malvern, AR including 12 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Resent to Delta Unit. (tg)
May 5, 2023 Filing 15 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jay Cantrell, Corley, Christopher Drumwright, Randell Fuller, Hurley, Tom Mulvaney, Nolan, Dominick Nunziato, Camron Stout, Benjamin Velasco and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #14 Order Directing Service, #10 Amended Complaint, #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (bjb)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Jay Cantrell, Corley, Christopher Drumwright, Randell Fuller, Hurley, Tom Mulvaney, Nolan, Dominick Nunziato, Camron Stout, Benjamin Velasco and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 5, 2023. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(bjb)
April 28, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address for Jerome Meraz to Dermott, AR. There are no documents to resend. (tg)
April 27, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying [ECF No. 11] Motion to Appoint Counsel. A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered the need for an attorney, the likelihood that Plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual and legal complexity of the case, and whether Plaintiff has the ability to investigate and present this case. In considering these factors, the Court finds that the claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and Plaintiff is adequately prosecuting this case at this time. The Court notes this case is in the early stages. The Court has not yet determined whether the complaint should be served on Defendnats. The Court finds Plaintiff is capable of prosecuting his claims without appointed counsel. At a later stage in the case, Plaintiff may again request appointment of counsel if Plaintiff believes the circumstances justify such an appointment. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on April 27, 2023. (smg)
April 26, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jerome M Meraz. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd)
April 26, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT (42:1983) against Camron Stout, Randell Fuller, Nolan, Hurley, Benjamin Velasco, Jay Cantrell, Dominick Nunziato, Tom Mulvaney, Christopher Drumwright, Corley, Washington County Jail, filed by Jerome M Meraz. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Jerome M Meraz.(lgd)
April 10, 2023 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting [ECF No. 8] Motion for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint. The Amended Complaint is due by May 3, 2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on April 10, 2023. (smg)
April 10, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) by Jerome M Meraz. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tg)
April 10, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address for Jerome Meraz to Malvern, AR. There are no documents to resend. (tg)
April 10, 2023 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS - Not at Facility. Mail originally sent to Jerome Meraz at Washington County Jail including Memo of Reassignment. No new address available. New Address due by 5/10/2023. (bjb)
April 5, 2023 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Mark E. Ford. Honorable Christy D. Comstock no longer assigned to the case. (hnc)
March 23, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Sheriff, Washington County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $26.87; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Washington County Detention Center). (lgd)
March 23, 2023 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350 from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed.( Amended Complaint due by 4/13/2023). Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on March 23, 2023. (lgd)
March 23, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Jerome M Meraz. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(lgd)
March 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Jay Cantrell, Corley, Christopher Drumwright, Randell Fuller, Hurley, Tom Mulvaney, Nolan, Dominick Nunziato, Camron Stout, Benjamin Velasco, filed by Jerome M Meraz.(lgd) (lgd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meraz v. Cantrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome M Meraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Jay Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Tom Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jailer Camron Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ex-Sheriff Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Dominick Nunziato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Benjamin Velasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Christopher Drumwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Randell Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe Dietician
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe Kitchen Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?