Oliver et al v. Southwest Homes of Arkansas, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Oliver and Casey Oliver
Defendant: Southwest Homes of Arkansas, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Oliver Builders, LLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv05205
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support by Southwest Homes of Arkansas, Inc.. (Stockland, Thomas)
January 3, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, to Dismiss, and for other relief filed by Casey Oliver, William Oliver, Oliver Builders, LLC. (Rozzell, George)
January 2, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint), Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim with Jury Demand by Casey Oliver, William Oliver, Oliver Builders, LLC.(Rozzell, George)
January 2, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Oliver Builders, LLC. Oliver Builders, LLC was sent waiver on 12/12/2023, answer due 2/12/2024; Casey Oliver was sent waiver on 12/12/2023, answer due 2/12/2024; William Oliver was sent waiver on 12/12/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Stockland, Thomas)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel by Southwest Homes of Arkansas, Inc.. (Stockland, Thomas)
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 2/27/2024 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/26/2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 14, 2023. (slc)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Oliver Builders, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Oliver Builders, LLC for service of the following document: #7 Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint), Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim. (Stockland, Thomas)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Oliver Builders, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Casey Oliver, William Oliver by Southwest Homes of Arkansas, Inc..(Stockland, Thomas)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Southwest Homes of Arkansas, Inc. served on 11/20/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit B- USPS Tracking)(Rozzell, George)
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Southwest Homes of Arkansas, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Southwest Homes of Arkansas Inc for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Rozzell, George)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Southwest Homes of Arkansas, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2877725), filed by William Oliver, Casey Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Offer Terms)(Rozzell, George)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Casey Oliver, William Oliver. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver et al v. Southwest Homes of Arkansas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Oliver
Represented By: George M. Rozzell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Oliver
Represented By: George M. Rozzell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Homes of Arkansas, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas D. Stockland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Oliver Builders, LLC
Represented By: George M. Rozzell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?