Shipp et al v. Central States Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Justin Shipp, Vincent Tate and Terrence Yazel
Defendant: Central States Manufacturing, Inc., Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors, Greatbanc Trust Co., James Sliker, Chad Ware, Thomas Ferree, Matt Kramer, Tina Chang and Matthew Stites
Case Number: 5:2023cv05215
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 42 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. LARRY M. BLOCHO JR. appearing for GREATBANC TRUST CO. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 12, 2024. (slc)
January 11, 2024 Filing 41 MOTION for Attorney Larry M. Blocho Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2906310) by Greatbanc Trust Co.. (Blocho, Larry)
January 10, 2024 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greatbanc Trust Co.. (Golumbic, Lars)
January 4, 2024 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Devin R Bates on behalf of Central States Manufacturing, Inc., Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors, Tina Chang, Thomas Ferree, Matt Kramer, James Sliker, Matthew Stites, Chad Ware. (Bates, Devin)
January 4, 2024 Filing 38 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. LARS C. GOLUMBIC appearing for GREATBANC TRUST CO. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 4, 2024. (slc)
January 4, 2024 Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ANDREW D. SALEK-RAHAM appearing for GREATBANC TRUST CO. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 4, 2024. (slc)
January 3, 2024 Filing 36 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #31 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond. Defendants must file their response pleadings on or before FEBRUARY 20, 2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 3, 2024. (slc)
January 3, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION for Attorney Lars C. Golumbic to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2900145) by Greatbanc Trust Co.. (Golumbic, Lars)
January 3, 2024 Filing 34 MOTION for Attorney Andrew D. Salek-Raham to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2900101) by Greatbanc Trust Co.. (Salek-Raham, Andrew)
January 3, 2024 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary A Gotto on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gotto, Gary)
January 3, 2024 Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Gary Gotto is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 3, 2024. (ee)
January 3, 2024 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond by Central States Manufacturing, Inc., Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors, Tina Chang, Thomas Ferree, Matt Kramer, James Sliker, Matthew Stites, Chad Ware. (Read, Nathan) Modified on 1/3/2024 (slc).
January 3, 2024 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiffs Justin Shipp, Vincent Tate, Terrence Yazel. Affidavit of Service, #30 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Jeffrey Lewis.(mll)
December 29, 2023 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service Central States Board)(Crowder, William)
December 29, 2023 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Greatbanc Trust Co. served on 12/18/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service GreatBanc)(Crowder, William)
December 29, 2023 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Matt Kramer served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service Matt Kramer)(Crowder, William)
December 28, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Lombardo on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lombardo, Eric)
December 28, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Gerend on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gerend, Matthew)
December 28, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney Gary A. Gotto to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2898743) by Justin Shipp, Vincent Tate, Terrence Yazel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gotto, Gary)
December 28, 2023 Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Eric Lombardo is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 28, 2023. (ee)
December 28, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney Eric G. Lombardo to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2898681) by Justin Shipp, Vincent Tate, Terrence Yazel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lombardo, Eric)
December 28, 2023 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Matthew Gerend is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 28, 2023. (ee)
December 28, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney Matthew M. Gerend to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2898258) by Justin Shipp, Vincent Tate, Terrence Yazel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gerend, Matthew)
December 13, 2023 Filing 20 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to All Defendants and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb)
December 13, 2023 Filing 19 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors c/o John Matthew Kramer for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 18 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors c/o Christopher Harrison for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 17 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors c/o Tina M. Chang for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 16 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors c/o Matthew K. Stites for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 15 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors c/o James A. Sliker for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors c/o Thomas J. Ferree for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 13 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors c/o Chad A. Ware for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to GreatBanc Trust Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 11 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Central States Manufacturing, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to John Matthew Kramer for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Tina M. Chang for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Matthew K. Stites for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Chad A. Ware for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Thomas J. Ferree for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to James Silker for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Crowder, William)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Thomas Crowder on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Crowder, William)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BARWDC-2881688), filed by Vincent Tate, Justin Shipp, Terrence Yazel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, ESOP Plan Document Amended and Restated, #2 Exhibit B, Central States ESOP Trust Agreement, #3 Exhibit C, 2020-1 Amendment, #4 Exhibit D, Central States - 2020 Releveraging Opinion)(Thrash, Thomas)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Justin Shipp, Vincent Tate, Terrence Yazel. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipp et al v. Central States Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Shipp
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Eric Lombardo
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Matthew Gerend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Tate
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Eric Lombardo
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Matthew Gerend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Yazel
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Eric Lombardo
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Matthew Gerend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central States Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Devin R Bates
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central States Manufacturing, Inc. Board of Directors
Represented By: Devin R Bates
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greatbanc Trust Co.
Represented By: Andrew Salek-Raham
Represented By: Larry M. Blocho, Jr
Represented By: Lars Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sliker
Represented By: Devin R Bates
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Ware
Represented By: Devin R Bates
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ferree
Represented By: Devin R Bates
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Kramer
Represented By: Devin R Bates
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Chang
Represented By: Devin R Bates
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Stites
Represented By: Devin R Bates
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?