Ruebel et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Randall W. Ruebel, Mario Hudson and Tammy L. Johnson
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc. and Board of Directors of Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv05216
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Diffee on behalf of Board of Directors of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Diffee, Christopher)
January 10, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy P. Blumenfeld on behalf of All Defendants. (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
January 5, 2024 Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SEAN McMAHAN is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 5, 2024. (slc)
January 5, 2024 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. MATHEW J. McKENNA is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 5, 2024. (slc)
January 5, 2024 Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. CHRISTOPHER M. DIFFEE is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 5, 2024. (slc)
January 5, 2024 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. JEREMY P. BLUMENFELD is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 5, 2024. (slc)
January 5, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney Sean McMahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2902307) by Board of Directors of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
January 5, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney Mathew J. McKenna to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2902304) by Board of Directors of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
January 5, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney Christopher M. Diffee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2902299) by Board of Directors of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
January 5, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney Jeremy P. Blumenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2902296) by Board of Directors of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is now due on February 8, 2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 18, 2023. (ee)
December 18, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Board of Directors of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
December 18, 2023 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Board of Directors of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Complaint and Summons, filed by Randall W. Ruebel, Mario Hudson, Tammy L. Johnson. Tyson Foods, Inc. served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. (Pulliam, Randall)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M Secunda on behalf of Mario Hudson, Tammy L. Johnson, Randall W. Ruebel. (Secunda, Paul)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. PAUL M. SECUNDA is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 1, 2023. (slc)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Tyson Foods, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Paul M. Secunda to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2883469) by Mario Hudson, Tammy L. Johnson, Randall W. Ruebel. (Pulliam, Randall)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Tyson Foods, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Pulliam, Randall)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 1132(a)(2) against Board of Directors of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2883456), filed by Randall W. Ruebel, Mario Hudson, Tammy L. Johnson.(Pulliam, Randall)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Mario Hudson, Tammy L. Johnson, Randall W. Ruebel. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruebel et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall W. Ruebel
Represented By: Randall K. Pulliam
Represented By: Paul M Secunda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Hudson
Represented By: Randall K. Pulliam
Represented By: Paul M Secunda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy L. Johnson
Represented By: Randall K. Pulliam
Represented By: Paul M Secunda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy P. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Karen P Freeman
Represented By: Christopher M. Diffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Directors of Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy P. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Karen P Freeman
Represented By: Christopher M. Diffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?