United States of America v. Real Property Located at 446 Angel Falls Ln., Springdale, AR
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 446 Angel Falls Ln., Springdale, AR
Claimant: Broker Solutions, Inc. doing business as New American Funding also known as New American Funding, LLC, Arvest Bank and New American Funding, LLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv05219
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1341 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Wulff on behalf of United States of America. (Wulff, Benjamin)
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 Verified CLAIM by Broker Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B, Mortgage)(Coleman, Charles)
January 3, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay by Real Property Located at 446 Angel Falls Ln., Springdale, AR. (Story, Travis)
January 3, 2024 Filing 14 Verified Claim CLAIM by Real Property Located at 446 Angel Falls Ln., Springdale, AR. (Story, Travis)
January 3, 2024 Filing 13 Verified Claim CLAIM by Real Property Located at 446 Angel Falls Ln., Springdale, AR. (Story, Travis)
January 3, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Wayne Story on behalf of Real Property Located at 446 Angel Falls Ln., Springdale, AR. (Story, Travis)
December 18, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by United States of America Affidavit of Service-Arvest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Candace)
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Arvest Bank.(Clark, William)
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 VERIFIED CLAIM by Arvest Bank. (Clark, William)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America Affidavit of Service-Travis W. Story (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Signature Card)(Taylor, Candace)
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture for New American Funding (Taylor, Candace)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture for Arvest (Taylor, Candace)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America, AFFIDAVIT of Service for Jason Carney served on 12/4/2023. (Taylor, Candace) Modified text on 12/8/2023 (hnc). Modified on 12/8/2023 to edit text (jlm).
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture for Lacey Carney (Taylor, Candace)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture for Jason Carney (Taylor, Candace)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against Real Property Located at 446 Angel Falls Ln., Springdale, AR, filed by United States of America.(Taylor, Candace) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/4/2023) (hnc).
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 446 Angel Falls Ln., Springdale, AR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Candace L. Taylor
Represented By: Benjamin Wulff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 446 Angel Falls Ln., Springdale, AR
Represented By: Travis Wayne Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Broker Solutions, Inc. doing business as New American Funding also known as New American Funding, LLC
Represented By: Charles Turner Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Arvest Bank
Represented By: William Fitzgerald Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: New American Funding, LLC
Represented By: Charles Turner Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?