Smith et al v. Kendricks, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa C Smith
Defendant: Dr. John Kendricks, M.D. and John Latour
Case Number: 5:2023cv05220
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed. Amended Complaint due by 2/13/2024. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on January 23, 2024. (lgd)
December 28, 2023 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on December 28, 2023. (smg)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.SEALED FINANCIAL RECORDS SUPPLEMENT to #2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff. (bjb)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (bjb)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY MOTION for Service by Vanessa C Smith. (bjb)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vanessa C Smith. (bjb)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Kendricks, M.D., John Latour, filed by Vanessa C Smith.(bjb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2023: #1 Exhibit) (bjb). Modified on 12/1/2023 (bjb).
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Vanessa C Smith. (bjb) Modified on 12/1/2023 (bjb).
December 1, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Christy D. Comstock: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vanessa C Smith. Motions referred to Honorable Christy D. Comstock.(bjb)
December 1, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Christy D. Comstock: 4 MOTION for Service filed by Vanessa C Smith. Motions referred to Honorable Christy D. Comstock.(bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Kendricks, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Kendricks, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Latour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?