Draper v. SSA Commissioner

Case Number: 6:2004cv06020
Filed: February 23, 2004
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2007 33 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, granting 29 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees in the amount of $ 2,246.51 filed by Teena Draper. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 5/9/07. (rls)
May 3, 2007 32 RESPONSE to Motion re 29 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
April 23, 2007 31 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 29 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees by Teena Draper. (Muse, Richard)
April 23, 2007 30 AFFIDAVIT filed by Teena Draper re 29 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5)(Muse, Richard)
April 23, 2007 29 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees by Teena Draper. (Muse, Richard) Modified on 4/24/2007 to add text (note: attachment A - attached to Affidavit doc # 30) (rls)
April 4, 2007 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $ 8,143.13. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 4/4/07. (rls)
March 19, 2007 27 RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 USC Sect. 406(b) filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
March 6, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
March 6, 2007 26 AFFIDAVIT filed by Teena Draper re 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4)(Muse, Richard)
March 6, 2007 25 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Teena Draper. (Muse, Richard)
March 6, 2007 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Teena Draper. (Attachments: # 1)(Muse, Richard)
January 6, 2006 23 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE to the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of the Court of Appeals in this case. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on 1/6/06. ***Civil Case Terminated. cc: (OHA)(rls)
December 27, 2005 22 USCA JUDGMENT reversing and remanding district court decision as to 17 Notice of Appeal filed by Teena Draper for proceedings consistent with the opinion of this court. (rls)
December 27, 2005 21 OPINION of USCA (certified copy) re 17 Notice of Appeal (rls)
February 17, 2005 20 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER from USCA; Appellate Docket Number 05-1483 (dmc)
February 14, 2005 2 COPIES OF NOTICE OF APPEAL, and 2 certified copies of clerk's docket entries, together with 2 copies of the Judgment and Memorandum Opinion filed 1/24/05; Order filed 2/23/04 granting pltf's motion for lv to proceed ifp; and 2 copies of NOA supplement mailed to Clerk, USCA, St. Louis, MO (rls)
February 14, 2005 19 TRANSMITTAL LETTER to clerk USCA re: NOA (rls)
February 11, 2005 18 TRANSMITTAL LETTER to counsel re: NOA (Larry McCord, Richard Muse) (rls)
February 11, 2005 17 NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Teena Draper from District Court decision re: judgment [16-2] dated 1/24/05 (cc: opposing counsel) (rls)
January 24, 2005 16 JUDGMENT: by Magistrate Bobby E. Shepherd in accordance with the memorandum opinion filed this date; affirming the decision of the Commissioner and dismissing complaint w/prej terminating case (cc: all counsel) (rls)
January 24, 2005 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION: by Magistrate Bobby E. Shepherd (cc: all counsel) (rls)
August 9, 2004 14 RESPONSE by defendant SSA Commissioner to motion to introduce new evidence [11-1] (rls)
August 9, 2004 14 SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL BRIEF by defendant SSA Commissioner (rls)
June 18, 2004 13 SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL BRIEF by plaintiff Teena Draper (rls)
June 18, 2004 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF by plaintiff Teena Draper in support of motion to introduce new evidence [11-1] (rls)
June 18, 2004 11 MOTION by plaintiff Teena Draper to introduce new evidence (rls)
June 9, 2004 10 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Bobby E. Shepherd finding the motion to extend time for two weeks to file appeal brief [8-1] moot, in light of the existing order granting pltf an ext until 6/22/04 to file her appeal brief (cc: all counsel) (rls)
June 7, 2004 9 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Bobby E. Shepherd granting motion to extend time for two weeks to file appeal brief [8-1], granting motion to extend time for two weeks in which to file her appeal brief [7-1], further allowing pltf to 6/22/04 in which to file her appeal brief and allowing deft until 8/22/04 in which to file her responsive appeal brief; no further extensions of time will be granted (cc: all counsel) (rls)
June 3, 2004 8 MOTION by plaintiff Teena Draper to extend time for two weeks to file appeal brief (rls)
May 24, 2004 7 MOTION by plaintiff Teena Draper to extend time for two weeks in which to file her appeal brief (rls)
April 22, 2004 TRANSCRIPT OF SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEEDINGS filed by defendant SSA Commissioner (cn)
April 22, 2004 6 ANSWER by defendant SSA Commissioner [1-1] (cn)
April 19, 2004 5 Featured Case ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren w/ consent forms A attached, referring case to Magistrate Bobby E. Shepherd (cc: all counsel) (jn)
March 25, 2004 4 RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant SSA Commissioner on 3/4/04 by svc on USA, further svc on U.S. Atty Gen on 3/9/04 and svc on SSA on 3/11/04 (rls)
February 23, 2004 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished to parties. (rls)
February 23, 2004 3 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Bobby E. Shepherd granting application [2-1] to proceed ifp; further dir clerk to file complt and dir pltf to serve a copy of the complt and copy of this order on the deft, SSA Commissioner, US Atty Gen and Assist U.S. Atty; deft is ordered to answer w/i 60 days from date of svc (cc: all counsel) (rls)
February 23, 2004 2 APPLICATION by plaintiff Teena Draper to proceed ifp (rls)
February 23, 2004 1 COMPLAINT ( 3 summons(es) issued) (referred to Magistrate Bobby E. Shepherd ) (rls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper v. SSA Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?