Davidson v. Wyeth et al

Case Number: 6:2005cv06074
Filed: October 12, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 116 Defendans' Motion for Summary Judgment. All other pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Honorable Billy Roy Wilson on February 14, 2011. (dmc)
January 19, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Preclude Any Expert Testimony; granting 38 Motion to Preclude Any Expert Testimony; granting 40 Motion to Preclude Any Expert Testimony. Signed by Joe J. Volpe on January 19, 2011. (dmc)
December 2, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Letter/Order Signed by Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/2/2010 re: short term use; brief by pltf due by 4:00 p.m. 12/7/2010; defts response brief due by 4:00 p.m. 12/10/2010. (maj)
November 24, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Letter re Short Term Use Hearing. Signed by Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/24/2010. (maj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?