Thompson v. Steed

Case Number: 6:2006cv06023
Filed: June 5, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto 50 Report and Recommendations, and plaintiff's 51 Response is overruled. Dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 9, 2009. (dmc)
May 21, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Damond Thompson. Objections to R&R due by 6/8/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 21, 2009. (rw)
February 13, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 40 Report and Recommendations.; denying 32 Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment. It is further ordered that this matter is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for evidentiary hearing on plaintiff's remaining claim. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 12, 2009. (dmc) Modified on 2/13/2009 to edit text (dmc).
January 15, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 32 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Melvin Steed. Objections to R&R due by 2/2/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 15, 2009. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?